Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-30135

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joel D Applebaum
Case #: 4:24-ap-03014
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2024
Terminated:Apr 16, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
FM Carpenters, LLC
2375 Cabot Street
Detroit, MI 48209
Represented By
FM Carpenters, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Collene Corcorcan
P.O. Box 535
Oxford, MI 48371
Represented By
Samuel D. Sweet
Samuel D. Sweet, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, July 01, 2024
16 16 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 07/01 5:10 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Special Counsel Filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcoran. (Beadle, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/19 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Clerk's Entry of Default
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/18 4:25 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcoran Related [+]. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Default Judgment Tue 04/16 3:37 PM
Default Judgment Against Defendant, FM Carpenters, LLC Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 11
12 12 misc Notice/Affidavit of Default Tue 04/16 1:26 PM
Notice/Affidavit of Default Filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcoran Related [+]. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Default Judgment
11 11 motion Default Judgment Tue 04/16 1:19 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcoran (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/16 10:29 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of FM Carpenters, LLC - Default Judgment Motion due by 4/30/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 04/16 3:38 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:24-ap-3014 : Default Judgment. (KEC)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/16 3:39 PM
Adversary Case 4:24-ap-3014 Closed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
9 9 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 04/15 4:12 PM
ENTERD IN ERROR- PLEASE DISREGARD Clerk's Entry of Default of FM Carpenters, LLC Default Judgment Motion due by 4/29/2024. (nlt) Modified on 4/15/2024 (nlt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 03/11 10:51 AM
Summons Service Executed on FM Carpenters, LLC 3/11/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Reissued Summons (auto) Mon 03/11 9:55 AM
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Request for Reissued Summons Mon 03/11 9:55 AM
Request for Reissued Summons filed by Samuel D. Sweet on behalf of Collene Corcorcan. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 10, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/11 1:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant
Friday, March 08, 2024
4 4 order Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Fri 03/08 12:03 PM
Order Regarding Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant FM Carpenters, LLC . Proper Service of Summons and Complaint Due on 3/15/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 02/29 11:39 AM
Summons Service Executed on FM Carpenters, LLC 2/29/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 02/29 11:36 AM
Summons Issued on FM Carpenters, LLC Answer Due 04/1/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/29 11:36 AM
Adversary case 24-03014 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Collene Corcorcan against FM Carpenters, LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 FM Carpenters Transfers.pdf