Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-30135

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joel D Applebaum
Case #: 4:24-ap-03016
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2024
Terminated:Mar 19, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
M.C. Gutherie Lumber Co.
P.O. Box 51877
Livonia, MI 48151
Represented By
M.C. Gutherie Lumber Co.
contact info
Plaintiff
Collene Corcorcan
P.O. Box 535
Oxford, MI 48371
Represented By
Samuel D. Sweet
Samuel D. Sweet, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/19 8:32 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff Collene Corcorcan. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 03/19 9:58 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:24-ap-3016 : Dismissed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/19 9:59 AM
Adversary Case 4:24-ap-3016 Closed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 02/29 12:44 PM
Summons Service Executed on M.C. Gutherie Lumber Co. 2/29/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 02/29 12:40 PM
Summons Issued on M.C. Gutherie Lumber Co. Answer Due 04/1/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/29 12:40 PM
Adversary case 24-03016 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Collene Corcorcan against M.C. Gutherie Lumber Co.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Gutherie Lumber Transfers