Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01041
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Terminated:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ally Financial Inc.
Represented By
Ally Financial Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, February 24, 2025
22 22 court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/24 10:32 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1041 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/08 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Settlement). (Valencia, Yamileth)
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/05 4:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 19 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
19 19 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/05 8:35 AM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Settlement). (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Fri 11/29 10:29 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
17 17 order Continue Hearing Order Wed 11/27 1:07 PM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Agreed Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 02/20/2025 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
16 16 motion Continue Hearing Fri 11/22 5:12 PM
Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/10 3:19 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
14 14 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Wed 07/10 2:26 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Continue Hearing Order Wed 07/10 9:54 AM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/12/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
12 12 motion Continue Hearing Tue 07/09 11:43 AM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
11 11 misc Request for Production of Documents Mon 06/24 3:17 PM
Trustee Kapila's First Request for Production of Documents from Ally Financial, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
10 10 answer Response Mon 05/06 7:04 PM
Response to (1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Filed by Defendant Ally Bank (Murray, Wanda)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 05/06 7:01 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Defendant Ally Bank. (Murray, Wanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/24 3:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Ally Financial Inc. Related [+]. (Murray, Wanda)
Related: [-] 7 Order Setting Status Hearing/Conference
Att: 1 Agreed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Extension
Monday, April 22, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Setting Status Hearing/Conference Mon 04/22 12:07 PM
Agreed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Extension. Resetting Status Conference . Status hearing to be held on 09/12/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 04/03 3:55 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Wanda D Murray Filed by Defendant Ally Bank. (Murray, Wanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
5 5 motion Extend Time Tue 04/02 4:40 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant Ally Bank (Murray, Wanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/05 5:14 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ally Financial Inc. 3/5/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant Ally Financial Inc.. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Mon 03/04 2:10 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/15/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Mon 03/04 2:07 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Ally Financial Inc. Answer Due 4/3/2024 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/01 9:29 AM
Adversary case 24-01041 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Ally Financial Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Aff-No Monies