Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:22-bk-12103
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Apr 20, 2022
Claims Deadline:May 26, 2022

Debtor
Sunshine Pools & Contracting Group, Inc.
13995 SW 144th Ave Ste 208
Miami, FL 33186-8656
Represented By
James A Poe
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Soneet Kapila
www.kapilatrustee.com PO Box 14213
Ft Lauderdale, FL 33302
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 03/18/2022 12:01 AM EDT
Thursday, March 17, 2022
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 03/17 1:36 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 22-12103 [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40623872. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF] Thu 03/17 1:34 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $338] (Poe, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business Asset) Thu 03/17 1:34 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 04/20/2022 at 09:30 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Proofs of Claim due by 05/26/2022. (Poe, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 attydoc Disclosure of Compensation Thu 03/17 1:34 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney James A Poe. (Poe, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 03/17 1:35 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Sunshine Pools & Contracting Group, Inc.. (Poe, James)
Related: [-]