Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01042
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Express Travel Related Services, American Express National Bank, American Express Company a/k/a American Express
Represented By
American Express Travel Related Services, American Express National Bank, American Express Company a/k/a American Express
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Filing Tue 03/04 10:24 AM
Notice of Filing Notice of Cancellation , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 21 Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of American Express (Corporate Party Representative) on March 5th, 2025 at 9:30 A.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Friday, February 21, 2025
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 02/22 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 02/21/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Agreed Fourth Motion To Continue Hearing On: Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/15/2025 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/19 4:07 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
23 23 order Continue Hearing Order Wed 02/19 2:42 PM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Agreed Fourth Motion To Continue Hearing On: Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/15/2025 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
22 22 motion Continue Hearing Mon 02/17 3:27 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Examination Tue 02/11 1:16 PM
Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of American Express (Corporate Party Representative) on March 5th, 2025 at 9:30 A.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Fri 11/29 10:32 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
19 19 order Continue Hearing Order Wed 11/27 1:11 PM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Agreed Third Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 02/20/2025 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
18 18 motion Continue Hearing Fri 11/22 5:18 PM
Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Filing Wed 08/07 11:28 AM
Notice of Filing Defendants' Responses and Objections to Trustee Kapila's First Request for Production of Documents , Filed by Defendants American Express Company, a/k/a American Express, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. Related [+]. (Jones, Jason)
Related: [-] 12 Trustee Kapila's First Request for Production of Documents from American Express Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/10 3:20 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
15 15 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Wed 07/10 2:28 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Continue Hearing Order Wed 07/10 9:57 AM
Order Granting Second Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/12/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
13 13 motion Continue Hearing Tue 07/09 11:40 AM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
12 12 misc Request for Production of Documents Mon 06/24 3:43 PM
Trustee Kapila's First Request for Production of Documents from American Express Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/03 11:51 AM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by American Express Company, a/k/a American Express, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.. (Jones, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/01 4:17 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Monday, April 29, 2024
9 9 order Continue Hearing Order Mon 04/29 1:25 PM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Agreed First Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 09/12/2024 at 02:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
8 8 motion Continue Hearing Wed 04/24 3:51 PM
First Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/09 7:02 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendants American Express Company, a/k/a American Express, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. Related [+]. (Jones, Jason)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, April 04, 2024
6 6 order Extend Time Order Thu 04/04 8:50 AM
Agreed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time for the Defendants to File Responsive Pleadings Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] # 5
Monday, April 01, 2024
5 5 motion Extend Time Mon 04/01 1:04 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings Filed by Defendants American Express Company, a/k/a American Express, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Jones, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/05 5:15 PM
Summons Service Executed on American Express Company, a/k/a American Express 3/5/2024; American Express National Bank 3/5/2024; American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. 3/5/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendants American Express Company, a/k/a American Express, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Mon 03/04 2:55 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/15/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Mon 03/04 2:53 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on American Express Company, a/k/a American Express Answer Due 4/3/2024; American Express National Bank Answer Due 4/3/2024; American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. Answer Due 4/3/2024 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/01 9:37 AM
Adversary case 24-01042 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against American Express Travel Related Services, American Express National Bank, American Express Company a/k/a American Express. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Aff-No Monies