Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01043
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Terminated:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, October 03, 2024
12 12 court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/03 11:08 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1043 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/14 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order of Dismissal (Settlement).
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/11 4:33 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 9 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
9 9 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 09/11 1:46 PM
Order of Dismissal (Settlement). (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Mon 05/13 3:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
7 7 order Continue Hearing Order Mon 05/13 11:22 AM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Hearing On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 09/12/2024 at 02:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
6 6 motion Continue Hearing Wed 05/08 2:33 PM
First Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Fri 05/03 11:07 AM
Notice of Filing Notice of Pending Settlement , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01043 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Aff-No Monies) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/05 5:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company 3/5/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Mon 03/04 3:01 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/15/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Mon 03/04 2:59 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Answer Due 4/3/2024 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/01 3:30 PM
Adversary case 24-01043 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Aff-No Monies