Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01045
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Terminated:May 02, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Grimm Brothers Enterprises, Inc
Represented By
Grimm Brothers Enterprises, Inc
contact info
Defendant
David Grimm
Represented By
David Grimm
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, May 02, 2024
9 9 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/02 3:16 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1045 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/09 3:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 7 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Monday, April 08, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/08 12:50 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Wed 04/03 2:22 PM
Joint Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/28 5:55 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by David Grimm, Grimm Brothers Enterprises, Inc. (Schwitalla, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/05 5:20 PM
Summons Service Executed on David Grimm 3/5/2024; Grimm Brothers Enterprises, Inc 3/5/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendants David Grimm, Grimm Brothers Enterprises, Inc. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Mon 03/04 3:09 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/15/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Mon 03/04 3:07 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on David Grimm Answer Due 4/3/2024; Grimm Brothers Enterprises, Inc Answer Due 4/3/2024 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/01 4:06 PM
Adversary case 24-01045 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Grimm Brothers Enterprises, Inc, David Grimm. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Aff-No Monies
Att: 2 Affidavit Aff-NonMili