Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01046
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Terminated:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
FHF I Manor Doral, LLC
Represented By
FHF I Manor Doral, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, October 03, 2024
16 16 court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/03 11:07 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1046 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/14 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order of Dismissal (Settlement).
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/11 4:41 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 13 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
13 13 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 09/11 1:49 PM
Order of Dismissal (Settlement). (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 05/13 3:50 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
11 11 order Continue Hearing Order Mon 05/13 11:31 AM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Hearing On: ( 5 Amended Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 09/12/2024 at 02:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
10 10 motion Continue Hearing Wed 05/08 2:23 PM
First Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(5 Amended Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Thu 04/25 2:17 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Pending Settlement , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01046 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against FHF I Manor Doral, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Aff-No Monies) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 3:58 PM
Summons Service Executed on FHF I Manor Doral, LLC 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant FHF I Manor Doral, LLC. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
7 7 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 03/15 4:06 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/15/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
6 6 court Amended Summons in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 03/15 3:56 PM
Amended Summons Issued on FHF I Manor Doral, LLC Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/15 1:11 PM
Amended Complaint by Soneet Kapila against FHF I Manor Doral, LLC. Complaint Amended to correct named Defendant and Transfers. Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01046 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against FHF I Manor Doral, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Aff-No Monies) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/05 5:22 PM
Summons Service Executed on FHF I Manor Doral, LLC 3/5/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant FHF I Manor Doral, LLC. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Mon 03/04 3:14 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/15/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Mon 03/04 3:12 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on FHF I Manor Doral, LLC Answer Due 4/3/2024 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/01 4:17 PM
Adversary case 24-01046 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against FHF I Manor Doral, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Aff-No Monies