Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-30135

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joel D Applebaum
Case #: 4:24-ap-03020
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:Apr 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fenton Glass Service, Inc.
327 N. Leroy St.
Fenton, MI 48430
Represented By
Fenton Glass Service, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Collene Corcorcan
P.O. Box 535
Oxford, MI 48371
Represented By
Samuel D. Sweet
Samuel D. Sweet, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/23 1:27 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff Collene Corcoran. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 04/23 1:54 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:24-ap-3020 : Dismissed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/23 1:55 PM
Adversary Case 4:24-ap-3020 Closed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
8 8 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Wed 04/03 4:02 PM
Order Extending Time for Fenton Glass Service, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to 5/10/2024 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Defendant Fenton Glass Service, Inc.
7 7 misc Stipulation Wed 04/03 12:12 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Samuel D. Sweet Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Fenton Glass Service, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Defendant Fenton Glass Service, Inc.. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 04/03 12:08 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Defendant Fenton Glass Service, Inc.. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/03 12:04 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Fenton Glass Service, Inc. Related [+]. (Miller, David)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Appearance
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/03 12:02 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Fenton Glass Service, Inc.. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 03/11 3:45 PM
Summons Service Executed on Fenton Glass Service, Inc. 3/11/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 03/11 3:36 PM
Summons Issued on Fenton Glass Service, Inc. Answer Due 04/10/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/11 3:36 PM
Adversary case 24-03020 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Collene Corcorcan against Fenton Glass Service, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Fenton Glass Service Transfers.pdf