Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-30135

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joel D Applebaum
Case #: 4:24-ap-03026
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Terminated:Mar 15, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Modern Drywall, Inc.
1000 N. Opdyke Rd., Ste. C
Auburn Hills, MI 48326
Represented By
Modern Drywall, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Collene Corcorcan
P.O. Box 535
Oxford, MI 48371
Represented By
Samuel D. Sweet
Samuel D. Sweet, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, March 15, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 03/15 11:35 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:24-ap-3026 : Dismissed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/15 11:36 AM
Adversary Case 4:24-ap-3026 Closed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/14 10:32 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff Collene Corcorcan. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/12 1:13 PM
Summons Service Executed on Modern Drywall, Inc. 3/12/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 03/12 1:10 PM
Summons Issued on Modern Drywall, Inc. Answer Due 04/11/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/12 1:10 PM
Adversary case 24-03026 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Collene Corcorcan against Modern Drywall, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Modern Drywall Transfers.pdf