Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01052
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Terminated:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bertha Lidia Diaz
Represented By
Bertha Lidia Diaz
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
32 32 court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/10 12:37 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1052 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/22 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/21/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
30 30 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/19 4:03 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 29 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
29 29 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/19 3:05 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/19 8:38 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
27 27 utility Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF] Tue 02/18 4:53 PM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Event Used. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO REFILE PLEADING USING THE CORRECT EVENT FOUND UNDER ADVERSARY-MOTIONS- DISMISS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING. Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 26 Notice of Filing Notice of Voluntary Dismissal , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Re:1 Adversary case 24-01052 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Bertha Lidia Diaz. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit NonMili-Bertha Diaz # 2 Affidavit No Monies-Aff) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila).
Monday, February 17, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Filing Mon 02/17 3:29 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Voluntary Dismissal , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01052 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Bertha Lidia Diaz. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit NonMili-Bertha Diaz # 2 Affidavit No Monies-Aff) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, January 09, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Filing Thu 01/09 11:01 AM
Notice of Filing Suggestion Of Bankruptcy Of Bertha Lidia Diaz , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/26 5:18 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
23 23 order Continue Hearing Order Tue 11/26 11:18 AM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Hearing On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 02/20/2025 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
22 22 motion Continue Hearing Mon 11/25 9:24 AM
Third Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Examination Mon 10/14 12:04 PM
Fifth Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of Bertha Lidia Diaz on November 4th, 2024 at 10:00 A.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Examination Tue 09/03 4:49 PM
Fourth Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of Bertha Lidia Diaz on October 17th, 2024 at 10:00 A.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Examination Wed 08/14 10:55 AM
Third Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of Bertha Lidia Diaz on October 3rd, 2024 at 1:00 P.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
18 18 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Wed 07/10 2:31 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/09 4:55 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
16 16 order Continue Hearing Order Tue 07/09 11:28 AM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference Re: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/12/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
15 15 motion Continue Hearing Mon 07/08 3:35 PM
Second Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(14 Notice of Examination)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Examination Fri 06/28 1:50 PM
Second Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of Bertha Lidia Diaz on August 19th, 2024 at 10:00 A.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
13 13 misc Request for Admissions Mon 06/24 2:13 PM
Trustee Kapila's First Set of Interrogatories, First Requests for Production and First Request for Admissions Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
12 12 notice Notice to Withdraw Document Wed 05/22 5:02 PM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Defendant Bertha Lidia Diaz Related [+]. (Del Pino, Haven)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Appearance
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 05/22 4:29 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Haven Del Pino Filed by Defendant Bertha Lidia Diaz. (Del Pino, Haven)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Filing Fri 05/17 10:49 AM
Notice of Filing Notice of Cancellation , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of Bertha Lidia Diaz on May 21st, 2024 at 10:00 A.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/01 5:06 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Monday, April 29, 2024
8 8 order Continue Hearing Order Mon 04/29 1:46 PM
Order Granting Ex-Parte First Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 09/12/2024 at 02:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 motion Continue Hearing Wed 04/24 4:14 PM
First Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Examination Mon 04/22 3:39 PM
Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of Bertha Lidia Diaz on May 21st, 2024 at 10:00 A.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/12 1:37 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Bertha Lidia Diaz . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 4:08 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bertha Lidia Diaz 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant Bertha Lidia Diaz. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 12:13 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 12:12 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Bertha Lidia Diaz Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/13 1:48 PM
Adversary case 24-01052 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Bertha Lidia Diaz. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit NonMili-Bertha Diaz
Att: 2 Affidavit No Monies-Aff