Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01053
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Raul Valdes
Represented By
Raul Valdes
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Friday, January 31, 2025
34 34 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/31 5:44 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 33 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion For Sanctions
33 33 order Compel Order Fri 01/31 12:10 PM
Order Granting in Part Motion To Compel Production of Documents from Defendant and Motion For Sanctions Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] # 27
Friday, January 10, 2025
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Mon 01/13 3:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 01/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Notice of Hearing (Re:27 Motion to Compel Production Of Documents From Defendant, and Motion For Sanctions Fees And Costs Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila [extracted and redocketed from ECF No.25] filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2025 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128.
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Mon 01/13 3:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 01/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Notice of Hearing (Re:25 Motion to Compel Production Of Documents From Defendant And For Sanctions Fees And Costs Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2025 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128.
Thursday, January 09, 2025
30 30 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/09 11:07 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 28 Notice of Hearing
29 29 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/09 8:38 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 26 Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
28 28 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Wed 01/08 12:24 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2025 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-] 27 Motion to Compel Production Of Documents From Defendant, and Motion For Sanctions Fees And Costs Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila [extracted and redocketed from ECF No.25] filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
26 26 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Wed 01/08 8:51 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2025 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to Compel Production Of Documents From Defendant And For Sanctions Fees And Costs Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
27 27 motion Compel Wed 01/08 12:10 PM
Motion to Compel Production Of Documents From Defendant, and Motion For Sanctions Fees And Costs Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila [extracted and redocketed from ECF No.25] (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Compel Tue 01/07 3:51 PM
**INCOMPLETE ENTRY - NOT ALL APPLICABLE RELIEFS CAPTURED - See ECF No.27 for correction**. Motion to Compel Production Of Documents From Defendant And For Sanctions Fees And Costs Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James) Modified on 1/8/2025 (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Fri 11/29 10:21 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
23 23 order Continue Hearing Order Wed 11/27 1:18 PM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Third Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 02/20/2025 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
22 22 motion Continue Hearing Fri 11/22 5:27 PM
Third Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Nonappearance Thu 10/03 3:19 PM
Notice of Nonappearance of Raul Valdes Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 20 Renewed Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of Raul Valdes on October 3rd, 2024 at 10:00 A.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Examination Wed 09/04 10:23 AM
Renewed Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of Raul Valdes on October 3rd, 2024 at 10:00 A.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Examination Wed 08/14 11:20 AM
Renewed Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of Raul Valdes on September 27th, 2024 at 1:00 P.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
18 18 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Wed 07/10 2:33 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/09 4:58 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
16 16 order Continue Hearing Order Tue 07/09 11:32 AM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Hearing On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/12/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
15 15 motion Continue Hearing Mon 07/08 3:41 PM
Second Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Examination Fri 06/28 2:20 PM
Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of Raul Valdes on August 27th, 2024 at 10:00 A.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
13 13 misc Request for Admissions Mon 06/24 1:55 PM
Trustee Kapila's First Set of Interrogatories, First Requests for Production and Request for Admissions Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/01 5:02 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Monday, April 29, 2024
11 11 order Continue Hearing Order Mon 04/29 1:48 PM
Order Granting Ex-Parte First Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference on: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 09/12/2024 at 02:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
10 10 motion Continue Hearing Wed 04/24 4:21 PM
First Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 20, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/21 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Raul Valdes (Re:6 Motion for Default Against Defendant Raul Valdes Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Non Military) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Friday, April 19, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/19 2:57 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by Raul Valdes . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/18 3:07 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Raul Valdes Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Against Defendant Raul Valdes Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Non Military) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
6 6 motion Default Wed 04/17 1:14 PM
Motion for Default Against Defendant Raul Valdes Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Non Military
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/17 1:12 PM
Notice of Filing Evidence of Service of , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01053 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Raul Valdes. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Aff-Non Mili # 2 Affidavit No Monies-Aff) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Raul Valdes Answer Due 4/15/2024,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila). Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 3:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on Raul Valdes 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant Raul Valdes. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 12:18 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 12:16 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Raul Valdes Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/13 1:57 PM
Adversary case 24-01053 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Raul Valdes. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Aff-Non Mili
Att: 2 Affidavit No Monies-Aff