Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01054
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Terminated:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
JV Shotcrete, Inc
Represented By
JV Shotcrete, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
31 31 misc Subpoena Tue 12/10 5:03 PM
Subpoena of Bank of America, Executed on December 10th, 2024, Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena-Bank of America
Thursday, December 05, 2024
30 30 misc Subpoena Thu 12/05 4:32 PM
Subpoena of JV Shotcrete, Inc., Executed on December 5th, 2024, Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Filing Mon 09/30 3:40 PM
Notice of Filing NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.055 , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 28 Answer to (26 Writ of Garnishment) Filed by Other Professional Bank of America, N.A. filed by Other Professional Bank of America, N.A.
28 28 answer Answer to Writ of Garnishment Mon 09/30 12:37 PM
Answer to (26 Writ of Garnishment) Filed by Other Professional Bank of America, N.A. (Noa, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/23 4:36 PM
Certificate of Service PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.041 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 25 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Bank of America, N.A. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,26 Writ of Garnishment
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
26 26 court Writ of Garnishment Wed 09/18 2:08 PM
COPY of Writ of Garnishment Related [+] (Original mailed to Plaintiff on 9/18/24) (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-] 25 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Bank of America, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cert-Final Judgment # 2 Exhibit Exh.B-Writ of Garnishment) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
25 25 motion Writ of Garnishment Application Tue 09/17 3:34 PM
Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Bank of America, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Cert-Final Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh.B-Writ of Garnishment
Thursday, August 22, 2024
24 24 court Close Adversary Case Thu 08/22 10:09 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1054 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/02 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Notice of Entry (Re:18 Final Judgment Against JV SHOTCRETE INC. (Valencia, Yamileth) )
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/02 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Notice of Entry (Re:18 Final Judgment Against JV SHOTCRETE INC. (Valencia, Yamileth) )
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/30 3:34 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 18 Judgment
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/30 3:33 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
19 19 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Tue 07/30 10:42 AM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 18 Final Judgment Against JV SHOTCRETE INC. (Valencia, Yamileth)
18 18 order Judgment Tue 07/30 10:38 AM
Final Judgment Against JV SHOTCRETE INC. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Default Judgment Order Tue 07/30 10:35 AM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Verified Motion For Entry Of Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] # 16
Friday, July 12, 2024
16 16 motion Default Judgment Fri 07/12 4:22 PM
Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against JV Shotcrete, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/12 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant JV Shotcrete, Inc (Re:13 Motion for Default Against Defendant JV Shotcrete, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
14 14 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 07/09 3:18 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant JV Shotcrete, Inc Related [+] (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Default Against Defendant JV Shotcrete, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Friday, July 05, 2024
13 13 motion Default Fri 07/05 10:47 AM
Motion for Default Against Defendant JV Shotcrete, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 16, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 06/17 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 06/16/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Granting Motion to Strike Defendants Answer Re: 9 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Friday, June 14, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/14 5:10 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Strike
10 10 order Strike Order Fri 06/14 11:09 AM
Order Granting Motion to Strike Defendants Answer Re: # 9 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
9 9 motion Strike Thu 06/06 4:19 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer 5 Answer to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/01 4:46 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Monday, April 29, 2024
7 7 order Continue Hearing Order Mon 04/29 1:50 PM
Order Granting Ex-Parte First Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 09/12/2024 at 02:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
6 6 motion Continue Hearing Wed 04/24 4:42 PM
First Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/16 3:18 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by JV Shotcrete, Inc . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 3:37 PM
Summons Service Executed on JV Shotcrete, Inc 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant JV Shotcrete, Inc. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 12:24 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 12:19 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on JV Shotcrete, Inc Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/13 2:11 PM
Adversary case 24-01054 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against JV Shotcrete, Inc. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit No Monies