Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01057
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Terminated:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
CY ROJAS, INC
Represented By
CY ROJAS, INC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, October 03, 2024
21 21 court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/03 10:29 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1057 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/14 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Valencia, Yamileth)
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/13 1:12 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 18 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 09/11 8:24 AM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Tue 09/10 9:18 AM
Joint Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
16 16 answer Objection Fri 07/19 6:58 PM
Limited Objection to (10 Notice of Examination filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) (Objection to Duces Tecum Request for Production Item "E" Only) Filed by Defendant CY ROJAS, INC (Schwitalla, James)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Response Fri 07/19 4:28 PM
Response to (9 Request for Admissions filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Filed by Defendant CY ROJAS, INC (Schwitalla, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/10 3:23 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
13 13 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Wed 07/10 2:42 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Continue Hearing Order Wed 07/10 9:48 AM
Order Granting Second Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/12/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
11 11 motion Continue Hearing Mon 07/08 4:44 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Examination Mon 07/08 4:40 PM
First Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of Cy Rojas, Inc. on September 16th, 2024 at 10:00 A.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
9 9 misc Request for Admissions Mon 06/24 2:40 PM
Trustee Kapila's First Set of Interrogatories, First Requests for Production and First Request for Admissions Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/01 4:21 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Monday, April 29, 2024
7 7 order Continue Hearing Order Mon 04/29 1:53 PM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Agreed First Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 09/12/2024 at 02:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
6 6 motion Continue Hearing Thu 04/25 9:01 AM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/11 3:22 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by CY ROJAS, INC. (Schwitalla, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 4:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on CY ROJAS, INC 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant CY ROJAS, INC. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 12:48 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 12:47 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on CY ROJAS, INC Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/13 3:06 PM
Adversary case 24-01057 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against CY ROJAS, INC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit No Monies