Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01058
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
D L J MIAMI INC
Represented By
D L J MIAMI INC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Friday, August 30, 2024
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 08/31 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 08/30/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order Denying Motion Requesting Permission to File a Late Answer (Re: 23 ) (Valencia, Yamileth)
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Wed 08/28 2:02 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Miscellaneous Motion
24 24 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Wed 08/28 11:11 AM
Order Denying Motion Requesting Permission to File a Late Answer Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] # 23
Thursday, August 22, 2024
23 23 motion Miscellaneous Motion Thu 08/22 11:52 AM
Motion Requesting the Court's Permission to file the late filed Answer Filed by Defendant D L J MIAMI INC (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
22 22 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/23 3:50 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1058 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Entry (Re:13 Final Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Against Defendant D L J Miami Inc . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) )
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Final Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Against Defendant D L J Miami Inc . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Entry (Re:13 Final Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Against Defendant D L J Miami Inc . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) )
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/09 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 **Restricted Due to Final Judgment Image Not Generated, See ECF #14** Notice of Entry (Re: 11 Final Judgment Against Defendant D L J MIAMI INC. (Valencia, Yamileth) ) (Valencia, Yamileth) Modified on 5/7/2024 .
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 05/09 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Granting Motion For Default Final Judgment (Re: 9 ) (Valencia, Yamileth)
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/09 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 **Restricted Due to Final Judgment Image Not Generated, See ECF #14** Notice of Entry (Re: 11 Final Judgment Against Defendant D L J MIAMI INC. (Valencia, Yamileth) ) (Valencia, Yamileth) Modified on 5/7/2024 .
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
15 15 utility Corrective Entry Tue 05/07 2:50 PM
Notice of Corrective Entry to Reflect ECF #11 Notice Not Generated and ECF #12 Restricted Due to Final Judgment Image Not Generated. Related [+]
Related: [-] 11 Final Judgment Against Defendant D L J MIAMI INC. (Valencia, Yamileth) Modified on 5/7/2024 .,12 (Re: 11 Final Judgment Against Defendant D L J MIAMI INC. (Valencia, Yamileth) ) (Valencia, Yamileth
14 14 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Tue 05/07 9:54 AM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 13 Final Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Against Defendant D L J Miami Inc . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
13 13 order Judgment Tue 05/07 9:52 AM
Final Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Against Defendant D L J Miami Inc . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
12 12 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Mon 05/06 4:52 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 11 Final Judgment Against Defendant D L J MIAMI INC. (Valencia, Yamileth)
11 11 order Judgment Mon 05/06 4:50 PM
Final Judgment Against Defendant D L J MIAMI INC. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Default Judgment Order Mon 05/06 4:47 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Final Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] # 9
Thursday, May 02, 2024
9 9 10 pgs motion Default Judgment Thu 05/02 2:06 PM
Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against D L J MIAMI INC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 20, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/21 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant D L J MIAMI INC (Re:6 Motion for Default Against Defendant D L J Miami Inc Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Thursday, April 18, 2024
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/18 3:21 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant D L J MIAMI INC Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Against Defendant D L J Miami Inc Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
6 6 motion Default Wed 04/17 2:19 PM
Motion for Default Against Defendant D L J Miami Inc Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/17 2:16 PM
Notice of Filing Evidence of Service of , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01058 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against D L J MIAMI INC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit No Monies) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on D L J MIAMI INC Answer Due 4/15/2024,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila). Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 3:51 PM
Summons Service Executed on D L J MIAMI INC 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant D L J MIAMI INC. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 12:50 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 12:49 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on D L J MIAMI INC Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/13 3:18 PM
Adversary case 24-01058 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against D L J MIAMI INC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit No Monies