Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01059
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Golden Pools Forever LLC
Represented By
Golden Pools Forever LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
29 29 misc Subpoena Wed 01/08 10:13 AM
Subpoena of Bank of America, N. A., Executed on January 8th, 2025, Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
28 28 misc Subpoena Tue 12/10 5:16 PM
Subpoena of Bank of America, Executed on December 10th, 2024, Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena-Bank of America
Sunday, December 08, 2024
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/09 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Entry (Re:23 Judgment in Favor of the Plaintiff, Soneet Kapila as the duly-appointed and permanent Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Debtor, Sunshine Pools & Contracting Group, Inc. (PO Box 14213, Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33302) Against the Garnishee, Bank of America, N. A. (Bank of America, N.A., Legal Order Processing, Attn: Brian Moynihan as President, P.O. Box 15047, Wilmington, DE 19850-5047 and Bank of America, N. A., Attn: Brian Moynihan as President, c/o: CT Corporation System as Registered Agent, 1200 South Pine Island Road, Plantation, FL 33324) . (Olivier, Mike) )
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/09 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Entry (Re:23 Judgment in Favor of the Plaintiff, Soneet Kapila as the duly-appointed and permanent Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Debtor, Sunshine Pools & Contracting Group, Inc. (PO Box 14213, Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33302) Against the Garnishee, Bank of America, N. A. (Bank of America, N.A., Legal Order Processing, Attn: Brian Moynihan as President, P.O. Box 15047, Wilmington, DE 19850-5047 and Bank of America, N. A., Attn: Brian Moynihan as President, c/o: CT Corporation System as Registered Agent, 1200 South Pine Island Road, Plantation, FL 33324) . (Olivier, Mike) )
Friday, December 06, 2024
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/06 4:51 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 23 Judgment
24 24 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Fri 12/06 10:53 AM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Olivier, Mike)
Related: [-] 23 Judgment in Favor of the Plaintiff, Soneet Kapila as the duly-appointed and permanent Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Debtor, Sunshine Pools & Contracting Group, Inc. (PO Box 14213, Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33302) Against the Garnishee, Bank of America, N. A. (Bank of America, N.A., Legal Order Processing, Attn: Brian Moynihan as President, P.O. Box 15047, Wilmington, DE 19850-5047 and Bank of America, N. A., Attn: Brian Moynihan as President, c/o: CT Corporation System as Registered Agent, 1200 South Pine Island Road, Plantation, FL 33324) . (Olivier, Mike)
23 23 order Judgment Fri 12/06 10:51 AM
Judgment in Favor of the Plaintiff, Soneet Kapila as the duly-appointed and permanent Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Debtor, Sunshine Pools & Contracting Group, Inc. (PO Box 14213, Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33302) Against the Garnishee, Bank of America, N. A. (Bank of America, N.A., Legal Order Processing, Attn: Brian Moynihan as President, P.O. Box 15047, Wilmington, DE 19850-5047 and Bank of America, N. A., Attn: Brian Moynihan as President, c/o: CT Corporation System as Registered Agent, 1200 South Pine Island Road, Plantation, FL 33324) . (Olivier, Mike)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Motion Wed 12/04 2:48 PM
Motion For Final Judgment Against Garnishee, Bank Of America, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Filing Fri 10/11 9:16 AM
Notice of Filing NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.055 , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 20 Answer to (18 Writ of Garnishment) Filed by Other Professional Bank of America, N.A. filed by Other Professional Bank of America, N.A.
Thursday, October 10, 2024
20 20 answer Answer to Writ of Garnishment Thu 10/10 2:00 PM
Answer to (18 Writ of Garnishment) Filed by Other Professional Bank of America, N.A. (Noa, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/23 4:58 PM
Certificate of Service PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.041 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Bank Of America, N.A. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,18 Writ of Garnishment
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
18 18 court Writ of Garnishment Wed 09/18 4:00 PM
Copy of Writ of Garnishment Related [+] (Original Mailed to Plaintiff on 9/18/24) (Leonard, Jahshima)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Bank Of America, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh.A-Cert-Final Judgment # 2 Exhibit Writ of Garnishment) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
17 17 motion Writ of Garnishment Application Tue 09/17 3:44 PM
Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Bank Of America, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh.A-Cert-Final Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit Writ of Garnishment
Thursday, May 23, 2024
16 16 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/23 3:48 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1059 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/09 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Judgment Against GOLDEN POOLS FOREVER LLC . (Valencia, Yamileth) )
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 05/09 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Final Judgment Against GOLDEN POOLS FOREVER LLC . (Valencia, Yamileth)
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/09 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Judgment Against GOLDEN POOLS FOREVER LLC . (Valencia, Yamileth) )
Monday, May 06, 2024
12 12 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Mon 05/06 4:56 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 11 Final Judgment Against GOLDEN POOLS FOREVER LLC . (Valencia, Yamileth)
11 11 order Judgment Mon 05/06 4:55 PM
Final Judgment Against GOLDEN POOLS FOREVER LLC . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Default Judgment Order Mon 05/06 4:53 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] # 9
Thursday, May 02, 2024
9 9 13 pgs motion Default Judgment Thu 05/02 2:44 PM
Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against GOLDEN POOLS FOREVER LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 20, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/21 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Golden Pools Forever LLC (Re:6 Motion for Default Against Defendant Golden Pools Forever LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Thursday, April 18, 2024
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/18 3:26 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Golden Pools Forever LLC Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Against Defendant Golden Pools Forever LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
6 6 motion Default Wed 04/17 2:26 PM
Motion for Default Against Defendant Golden Pools Forever LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/17 2:24 PM
Notice of Filing Evidence of Service of , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01059 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Golden Pools Forever LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit No Monies) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Golden Pools Forever LLC Answer Due 4/15/2024,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila). Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 3:41 PM
Summons Service Executed on Golden Pools Forever LLC 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant Golden Pools Forever LLC. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 12:53 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 12:52 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Golden Pools Forever LLC Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/13 3:23 PM
Adversary case 24-01059 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Golden Pools Forever LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit No Monies