Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01061
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Terminated:May 02, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Instyle Pools Solutions, Inc
Represented By
Instyle Pools Solutions, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, May 02, 2024
9 9 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/02 3:14 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1061 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 06, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/07 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Thursday, April 04, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/04 3:41 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 6 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
6 6 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Thu 04/04 8:52 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Mon 04/01 1:15 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 3:46 PM
Summons Service Executed on Instyle Pools Solutions, Inc 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant Instyle Pools Solutions, Inc. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 12:58 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 12:57 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Instyle Pools Solutions, Inc Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/13 3:38 PM
Adversary case 24-01061 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Instyle Pools Solutions, Inc. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit No Monies