Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01062
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
JBK General Services, Inc.
Represented By
JBK General Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, March 03, 2025
43 43 notice Notice of Filing Mon 03/03 11:45 AM
Notice of Filing Notice of Non-Compliance by JBK General Services, Inc. , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 37 Agreed Order On Defendant's Motion To Vacate Final Judgment (Re: 25 ) (Rodriguez, Olga)
Saturday, February 08, 2025
42 42 notice Notice of Filing Sat 02/08 1:48 PM
Notice of Filing Notice to Withdraw Appearance , Filed by Defendant JBK General Services, Inc.. (Gleason, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
41 41 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 12/21 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 12/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 39 Final Judgment in Garnishment . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
40 40 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/18 5:14 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 39 Judgment
39 39 order Judgment Wed 12/18 3:33 PM
Final Judgment in Garnishment . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
38 38 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/16 9:33 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 37 Order on Motion to Vacate
Friday, December 13, 2024
37 37 order Vacate Order Fri 12/13 4:41 PM
Agreed Order On Defendant's Motion To Vacate Final Judgment Related [+] (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-] # 25
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
36 36 answer Response Tue 11/12 3:32 PM
Response to (25 Motion to Vacate (Re:11 Judgment) filed by Defendant JBK General Services, Inc.) and Objection Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice of Filing Tue 11/12 1:32 PM
Notice of Filing Certification of Geovany E Novak , Filed by Defendant JBK General Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Gleason, Kevin)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to Vacate (Re:11 Judgment) Filed by Defendant JBK General Services, Inc. filed by Defendant JBK General Services, Inc.
Thursday, October 31, 2024
34 34 court Notification of Returned Mail Thu 10/31 3:32 PM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice (ECF #23), has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Gonzalez, Maria)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Filing Thu 10/31 3:20 PM
Notice of Filing Of Unclaimed Certified Mail , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01062 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against JBK General Services, Inc. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit No Monies) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on JBK General Services, Inc. Answer Due 4/15/2024,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila). Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Monday, October 21, 2024
32 32 misc Certificate of Service Mon 10/21 2:57 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 31 Notice of Hearing
31 31 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Mon 10/21 7:48 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-] 30 Motion For Final Judgment Against Garnishee, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Friday, October 18, 2024
30 30 motion Miscellaneous Motion Fri 10/18 4:56 PM
Motion For Final Judgment Against Garnishee, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Filing Fri 10/18 4:50 PM
Notice of Filing Evidence Of Compliance With Garnishee's Fees As Required By Florida Law , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 21 Answer to Answer of Garnishee and Demand to Judgment Creditor for Payment of Attorneys' Fees Filed by Attorney JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Attorney JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
28 28 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Fri 10/18 3:52 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Kevin C Gleason Esq Related [+]. (Gleason, Kevin)
Related: [-] 26 Notice of Hearing
27 27 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Fri 10/18 3:51 PM
Certificate of Service Amended by Attorney Kevin C Gleason Esq Related [+]. (Gleason, Kevin)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to Vacate (Re:11 Judgment) filed by Defendant JBK General Services, Inc.
26 26 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Fri 10/18 1:08 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to Vacate (Re:11 Judgment) Filed by Defendant JBK General Services, Inc. filed by Defendant JBK General Services, Inc.
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
25 25 motion Vacate Tue 10/15 11:31 PM
Motion to Vacate Related [+] Filed by Defendant JBK General Services, Inc. (Gleason, Kevin)
Related: [-] 11 Judgment
Sunday, September 29, 2024
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 09/30 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 09/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order Denying Defendants Motion to Reopen and Set Aside Final Judgment (Re: 20 )
Friday, September 27, 2024
23 23 order Reconsider Order Fri 09/27 2:23 PM
Order Denying Defendants Motion to Reopen and Set Aside Final Judgment Related [+] (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] # 20
22 22 notice Notice of Filing Fri 09/27 1:57 PM
Notice of Filing NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.055 , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 21 Answer to Answer of Garnishee and Demand to Judgment Creditor for Payment of Attorneys' Fees Filed by Attorney JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Attorney JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
21 21 answer Answer to Writ of Garnishment Fri 09/27 12:10 PM
Answer to Answer of Garnishee and Demand to Judgment Creditor for Payment of Attorneys' Fees Filed by Attorney JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Herron, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
20 20 motion Reconsider Wed 09/25 11:34 AM
Motion to Reconsider Related [+] Filed by Defendant JBK General Services, Inc. (Olivier, Mike)
Related: [-] 11 Final Judgment
Monday, September 23, 2024
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/23 5:02 PM
Certificate of Service PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.041 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,18 Writ of Garnishment
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
18 18 court Writ of Garnishment Wed 09/18 4:02 PM
COPY OF Writ of Garnishment Related [+] (Original Mailed to Plaintiff on 9/18/24) (Leonard, Jahshima)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cert. Final Judgment # 2 Exhibit Writ of Garnishment) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
17 17 motion Writ of Garnishment Application Tue 09/17 4:08 PM
Motion for Writ of Garnishment To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Cert. Final Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit Writ of Garnishment
Thursday, May 23, 2024
16 16 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/23 3:46 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1062 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/11 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Judgment Against Defendant JBK General Services, Inc. (Valencia, Yamileth) )
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/11 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Final Judgment Against Defendant JBK General Services, Inc. (Valencia, Yamileth)
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/11 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Judgment Against Defendant JBK General Services, Inc. (Valencia, Yamileth) )
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
12 12 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Wed 05/08 2:56 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 11 Final Judgment Against Defendant JBK General Services, Inc. (Valencia, Yamileth)
11 11 order Judgment Wed 05/08 2:53 PM
Final Judgment Against Defendant JBK General Services, Inc. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Default Judgment Order Wed 05/08 2:37 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Final Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] # 9
Thursday, May 02, 2024
9 9 10 pgs motion Default Judgment Thu 05/02 2:37 PM
Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against JBK GENERAL SERVICES, INC. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 20, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/21 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant JBK General Services, Inc. (Re:6 Motion for Default Against Defendant JBK General Services, Inc Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Thursday, April 18, 2024
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/18 3:35 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant JBK General Services, Inc. Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Against Defendant JBK General Services, Inc Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
6 6 motion Default Wed 04/17 2:51 PM
Motion for Default Against Defendant JBK General Services, Inc Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/17 2:50 PM
Notice of Filing Evidence of Service of , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01062 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against JBK General Services, Inc. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit No Monies) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on JBK General Services, Inc. Answer Due 4/15/2024,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila). Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 3:34 PM
Summons Service Executed on JBK General Services, Inc. 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant JBK General Services, Inc.. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 1:00 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 12:59 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on JBK General Services, Inc. Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/13 3:46 PM
Adversary case 24-01062 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against JBK General Services, Inc. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit No Monies