Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01063
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
JG Heavy Equipment Corp
Represented By
JG Heavy Equipment Corp
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, November 14, 2024
47 47 court Notification of Returned Mail Thu 11/14 12:12 PM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document mailed to the party (ECF # 38) indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Gonzalez, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
46 46 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/07 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 42 Notice of Entry (Re:41 Final Judgment in Garnishment . (Valencia, Yamileth) )
45 45 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 11/07 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 11/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 41 Final Judgment in Garnishment . (Valencia, Yamileth)
44 44 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/07 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 42 Notice of Entry (Re:41 Final Judgment in Garnishment . (Valencia, Yamileth) )
Monday, November 04, 2024
43 43 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/04 1:30 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 41 Judgment
42 42 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Mon 11/04 11:47 AM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 41 Final Judgment in Garnishment . (Valencia, Yamileth)
41 41 order Judgment Mon 11/04 11:43 AM
Final Judgment in Garnishment . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
40 40 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 10/31 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/30/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 38 Order Denying Motion to Vacate Default Final Judgment (Re: 26 ) (Valencia, Yamileth)
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 10/31 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/30/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 37 Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment (Re: 27 ) And Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Final Judgment Against Garnishee (Re: 31 ) (Valencia, Yamileth)
Monday, October 28, 2024
38 38 order Vacate Order Mon 10/28 5:12 PM
Order Denying Motion to Vacate Default Final Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] # 26
37 37 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Mon 10/28 5:10 PM
Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment Related [+] And Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Final Judgment Against Garnishee (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] # 27 # 31
Thursday, October 24, 2024
36 36 notice Notice of Filing Thu 10/24 11:33 AM
Notice of Filing Of Unclaimed Certified Mail , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 22 Notice of Filing NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.055 , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Re:21 Answer to Answer of Garnishee and Demand to Judgment Creditor for Payment of Attorneys' Fees Filed by Other Professional JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Other Professional JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.). filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Filing Wed 10/23 5:23 PM
Notice of Filing Affidavit of Amado Sabina , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
34 34 answer Response Tue 10/22 1:03 PM
Response to (26 Expedited Motion to Vacate (Re:10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,11 Judgment) filed by Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp,27 Motion to Vacate (Re:19 Writ of Garnishment) filed by Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp) Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "1" - Unclaimed Certified Mail Package (with Complaint, Summons and Order Setting Deadlines)
Att: 2 Exhibit "2" - Sunbiz.org Public Records
Att: 3 Exhibit "3" - Gennaro Vacatur Order of Opinion
Friday, October 18, 2024
33 33 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/18 3:01 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 32 Notice of Hearing
32 32 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Fri 10/18 2:39 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-] 31 Ex Parte Motion For Final Judgment Against Garnishee, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
31 31 motion Miscellaneous Motion Fri 10/18 2:29 PM
Ex Parte Motion For Final Judgment Against Garnishee, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Filing Fri 10/18 2:22 PM
Notice of Filing Evidence Of Compliance With Garnishee's Fees As Required By Florida Law , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 21 Answer to Answer of Garnishee and Demand to Judgment Creditor for Payment of Attorneys' Fees Filed by Other Professional JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Other Professional JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
29 29 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/16 4:44 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp Related [+]. (Sweetbaum, Ari)
Related: [-] 26 Expedited Motion to Vacate (Re:10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,11 Judgment) filed by Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp,27 Motion to Vacate (Re:19 Writ of Garnishment) filed by Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp,28 Notice of Hearing
28 28 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Wed 10/16 1:42 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-] 26 Expedited Motion to Vacate (Re:10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,11 Judgment) Filed by Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp filed by Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp,27 Motion to Vacate (Re:19 Writ of Garnishment) Filed by Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp filed by Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
27 27 motion Vacate Tue 10/15 10:56 AM
Motion to Vacate Related [+] Filed by Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp (Sweetbaum, Ari)
Related: [-] 19 Writ of Garnishment
Monday, October 14, 2024
26 26 motion Vacate Mon 10/14 7:33 PM
Expedited Motion to Vacate Related [+] Filed by Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp (Sweetbaum, Ari)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,11 Judgment
Att: 1 Composite Exhibit A
Att: 2 Composite Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
25 25 notice Notice to Withdraw Document Wed 10/09 4:11 PM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp Related [+]. (Sweetbaum, Ari)
Related: [-] 24 Claim of Exemption and Request for Hearing
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
24 24 misc Claim of Exemption and Request for Hearing Tue 10/08 5:00 PM
Claim of Exemption and Request for Hearing [Service Executed by Mail] Filed by Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp. (Sweetbaum, Ari)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 10/02 2:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Ari A Sweetbaum Filed by Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp. (Sweetbaum, Ari)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Filing Thu 09/26 1:47 PM
Notice of Filing NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.055 , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 21 Answer to Answer of Garnishee and Demand to Judgment Creditor for Payment of Attorneys' Fees Filed by Other Professional JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Other Professional JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
21 21 answer Answer to Writ of Garnishment Thu 09/26 12:01 PM
Answer to Answer of Garnishee and Demand to Judgment Creditor for Payment of Attorneys' Fees Filed by Other Professional JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Herron, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/23 5:00 PM
Certificate of Service PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.041 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,19 Writ of Garnishment
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
19 19 court Writ of Garnishment Wed 09/18 4:05 PM
COPY OF Writ of Garnishment Related [+] (Original Mailed to Plaintiff on 9/18/24) (Leonard, Jahshima)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cert Final Judgment # 2 Exhibit Writ of Ganishment) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
18 18 motion Writ of Garnishment Application Tue 09/17 3:56 PM
Motion for Writ of Garnishment To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Cert Final Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit Writ of Ganishment
Thursday, May 23, 2024
17 17 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/23 3:57 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1063 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/11 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Judgment Against Defendant JG HEAVY EQUIPMENT CORP. (Valencia, Yamileth) )
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/11 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Final Judgment Against Defendant JG HEAVY EQUIPMENT CORP. (Valencia, Yamileth)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/11 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Granting Motion For Default Final Judgment (Re: 9 ) (Valencia, Yamileth)
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/11 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Judgment Against Defendant JG HEAVY EQUIPMENT CORP. (Valencia, Yamileth) )
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
12 12 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Wed 05/08 3:03 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 11 Final Judgment Against Defendant JG HEAVY EQUIPMENT CORP. (Valencia, Yamileth)
11 11 order Judgment Wed 05/08 3:01 PM
Final Judgment Against Defendant JG HEAVY EQUIPMENT CORP. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Default Judgment Order Wed 05/08 2:58 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Final Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] # 9
Thursday, May 02, 2024
9 9 10 pgs motion Default Judgment Thu 05/02 2:53 PM
Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against JG HEAVY EQUIPMENT CORP. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 28, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 04/29 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp (Re:6 Motion for Default Against Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Friday, April 26, 2024
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 04/26 11:53 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Against Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, April 25, 2024
6 6 motion Default Thu 04/25 2:06 PM
Motion for Default Against Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Thu 04/25 2:02 PM
Notice of Filing Evidence of Service of , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01063 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against JG Heavy Equipment Corp. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit No Monies) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on JG Heavy Equipment Corp Answer Due 4/15/2024,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila). Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 4:13 PM
Summons Service Executed on JG Heavy Equipment Corp 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant JG Heavy Equipment Corp. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 1:04 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 03/14 1:03 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on JG Heavy Equipment Corp Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/13 4:33 PM
Adversary case 24-01063 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against JG Heavy Equipment Corp. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit No Monies