Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:24-bk-50408
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Apr 11, 2024

Debtor
Autotex Financial, Inc.
12417 Vista Rim
Live Oak, TX 78233-6230
Represented By
Martin Seidler
Law Offices Of Martin Seidler
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Randolph N Osherow
342 W Woodlawn, Suite 100
San Antonio, TX 78212


Docket last updated: 03/15/2024 12:04 AM CDT
Thursday, March 14, 2024
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Thu 03/14 4:28 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (csupld)([LINK 24-50408 ) [caseupld,vol7cu] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A24296762 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Thu 03/14 4:27 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) Without Schedules, Without Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) filed by Autotex Financial, Inc.. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 03/21/2024 (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court 341 Meeting 7 (Business No Asset) Thu 03/14 4:29 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Osherow, Randolph N added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/11/2024 at 11:00 AM at Via Phone: (877)937-4915; Code: 7491951#. (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document) Thu 03/14 4:42 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Martin Seidler for Debtor Autotex Financial, Inc.. (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-] stricted Document1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) Without Schedules, Without Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) filed by Autotex Financial, Inc.. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 03/21/2024