Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01068
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
ROLO FLOORING INC
Represented By
ROLO FLOORING INC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
50 50 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/19 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 47 Notice of Entry (Re:46 Final Judgment in Garnishment. (Rodriguez, Olga) )
49 49 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/19 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 47 Notice of Entry (Re:46 Final Judgment in Garnishment. (Rodriguez, Olga) )
Monday, December 16, 2024
48 48 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/16 10:43 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 46 Judgment
Friday, December 13, 2024
47 47 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Fri 12/13 9:27 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-] 46 Final Judgment in Garnishment. (Rodriguez, Olga)
46 46 order Judgment Fri 12/13 9:26 PM
Final Judgment in Garnishment. (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-]