Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01069
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Terminated:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Y V MECHANICAL SPECIALIST INC
Represented By
Y V MECHANICAL SPECIALIST INC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, October 03, 2024
21 21 court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/03 10:26 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1069 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/14 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Valencia, Yamileth)
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/13 1:13 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 18 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 09/11 8:26 AM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Tue 09/10 9:13 AM
Joint Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
16 16 answer Objection Fri 07/19 6:59 PM
Limited Objection to (11 Notice of Examination filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) (Objection to Duces Tecum Request for Production Item "E" Only) Filed by Defendant Y V MECHANICAL SPECIALIST INC (Schwitalla, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/10 3:22 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
14 14 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Wed 07/10 2:44 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Continue Hearing Order Wed 07/10 9:52 AM
Order Granting Second Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/12/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
12 12 motion Continue Hearing Mon 07/08 5:06 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Examination Mon 07/08 4:53 PM
First Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of Y V Mechanical Specialist, Inc. on September 24th, 2024 at 10:00 A.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
10 10 answer Response Mon 06/24 4:16 PM
Response to (9 Request for Admissions filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Filed by Defendant Y V MECHANICAL SPECIALIST INC (Schwitalla, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Request for Admissions Mon 06/24 2:56 PM
Trustee Kapila's First Set of Interrogatories, First Requests for Production and First Request for Admissions Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/01 4:26 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Monday, April 29, 2024
7 7 order Continue Hearing Order Mon 04/29 1:27 PM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Agreed First Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 09/12/2024 at 02:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
6 6 motion Continue Hearing Thu 04/25 9:22 AM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/11 4:44 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by Y V MECHANICAL SPECIALIST INC. (Schwitalla, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 4:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on Y V MECHANICAL SPECIALIST INC 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant Y V MECHANICAL SPECIALIST INC. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 03/15 12:37 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 03/15 12:36 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Y V MECHANICAL SPECIALIST INC Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/14 3:02 PM
Adversary case 24-01069 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Y V MECHANICAL SPECIALIST INC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit No Monies