Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01071
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
RIO'S CONCRETE, PUMPING AND RENTAL, INC
Represented By
RIO'S CONCRETE, PUMPING AND RENTAL, INC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Sunday, December 08, 2024
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/09 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Notice of Entry (Re:30 Judgment in Favor of the Plaintiff, Soneet Kapila as the duly-appointed and permanent Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Debtor, Sunshine Pools & Contracting Group, Inc. (PO Box 14213, Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33302) Against the Garnishee, Amerant Bank, N.A. (Amerant Bank, N.A., Legal Department, Attn: Jerry Plush as President, 220 Alhambra Cir., Coral Gables, FL 33134 and Amerant Bank, N. A., Attn: Martin S. Marshall as Registered Agent, 220 Alhambra Cir., Coral Gables, FL 33134) . (Olivier, Mike) )
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/09 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Notice of Entry (Re:30 Judgment in Favor of the Plaintiff, Soneet Kapila as the duly-appointed and permanent Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Debtor, Sunshine Pools & Contracting Group, Inc. (PO Box 14213, Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33302) Against the Garnishee, Amerant Bank, N.A. (Amerant Bank, N.A., Legal Department, Attn: Jerry Plush as President, 220 Alhambra Cir., Coral Gables, FL 33134 and Amerant Bank, N. A., Attn: Martin S. Marshall as Registered Agent, 220 Alhambra Cir., Coral Gables, FL 33134) . (Olivier, Mike) )
Friday, December 06, 2024
32 32 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/06 5:01 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 30 Judgment
31 31 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Fri 12/06 10:57 AM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Olivier, Mike)
Related: [-] 30 Judgment in Favor of the Plaintiff, Soneet Kapila as the duly-appointed and permanent Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Debtor, Sunshine Pools & Contracting Group, Inc. (PO Box 14213, Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33302) Against the Garnishee, Amerant Bank, N.A. (Amerant Bank, N.A., Legal Department, Attn: Jerry Plush as President, 220 Alhambra Cir., Coral Gables, FL 33134 and Amerant Bank, N. A., Attn: Martin S. Marshall as Registered Agent, 220 Alhambra Cir., Coral Gables, FL 33134) . (Olivier, Mike)
30 30 order Judgment Fri 12/06 10:56 AM
Judgment in Favor of the Plaintiff, Soneet Kapila as the duly-appointed and permanent Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Debtor, Sunshine Pools & Contracting Group, Inc. (PO Box 14213, Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33302) Against the Garnishee, Amerant Bank, N.A. (Amerant Bank, N.A., Legal Department, Attn: Jerry Plush as President, 220 Alhambra Cir., Coral Gables, FL 33134 and Amerant Bank, N. A., Attn: Martin S. Marshall as Registered Agent, 220 Alhambra Cir., Coral Gables, FL 33134) . (Olivier, Mike)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Motion Thu 12/05 10:24 AM
Motion For Final Judgment Against Garnishee, Amerant Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Filing Thu 11/14 11:47 AM
Notice of Filing NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.055 , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 27 Answer to (24 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Amerant Bank, N.A. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,25 Writ of Garnishment) Filed by Interested Party Amerant Bank NA filed by Interested Party Amerant Bank NA
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
27 27 answer Answer to Writ of Garnishment Wed 11/13 7:32 PM
Answer to (24 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Amerant Bank, N.A. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,25 Writ of Garnishment) Filed by Interested Party Amerant Bank NA (Rones, Victor)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Filing Mon 11/04 3:29 PM
Notice of Filing CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.041 , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 24 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Amerant Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Final Judgment # 2 Exhibit Exh. B - Writ) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,25 Copy of Writ of Garnishment (Re:24 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Amerant Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Final Judgment # 2 Exhibit Exh. B - Writ) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) (Original Mailed to Plaintiff on 11/01/2024)
Friday, November 01, 2024
25 25 court Writ of Garnishment Fri 11/01 2:11 PM
Copy of Writ of Garnishment Related [+] (Original Mailed to Plaintiff on 11/01/2024) (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 24 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Amerant Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Final Judgment # 2 Exhibit Exh. B - Writ) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
24 24 motion Writ of Garnishment Application Wed 10/30 10:38 AM
Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Amerant Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Final Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. B - Writ
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
23 23 misc Subpoena Tue 10/01 11:04 AM
Subpoena of Bank United, N.A., Executed on October 1st, 2024, Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Filing Mon 09/30 11:53 AM
Notice of Filing NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.055 , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 21 Answer to (19 Writ of Garnishment) and Demand for Garnishment Fee Filed by Interested Party BankUnited, N.A. filed by Interested Party BankUnited, N.A.
21 21 answer Answer to Writ of Garnishment Mon 09/30 9:13 AM
Answer to (19 Writ of Garnishment) and Demand for Garnishment Fee Filed by Interested Party BankUnited, N.A. (Carman, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/23 5:07 PM
Certificate of Service PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.041 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Bank United, N.A. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,19 Writ of Garnishment
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
19 19 court Writ of Garnishment Wed 09/18 4:40 PM
Copy of Writ of Garnishment Related [+](Original Mailed to Plaintiff on 09/18/2024) (Gonzalez, Maria)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Bank United, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cert. Final Judgment # 2 Exhibit Writ of Garnishment) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
18 18 motion Writ of Garnishment Application Tue 09/17 4:35 PM
Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Bank United, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Cert. Final Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit Writ of Garnishment
Thursday, May 23, 2024
17 17 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/23 3:39 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1071 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/11 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Judgment Against Rios Concrete, Pumping and Rental, Inc. . (Valencia, Yamileth) )
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/11 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Final Judgment Against Rios Concrete, Pumping and Rental, Inc. . (Valencia, Yamileth)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/11 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Granting Motion For Default Final Judgment (Re: 9 ) (Valencia, Yamileth)
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/11 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Judgment Against Rios Concrete, Pumping and Rental, Inc. . (Valencia, Yamileth) )
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
12 12 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Wed 05/08 3:35 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 11 Final Judgment Against Rios Concrete, Pumping and Rental, Inc. . (Valencia, Yamileth)
11 11 order Judgment Wed 05/08 3:34 PM
Final Judgment Against Rios Concrete, Pumping and Rental, Inc. . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Default Judgment Order Wed 05/08 3:33 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Final Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] # 9
Thursday, May 02, 2024
9 9 10 pgs motion Default Judgment Thu 05/02 3:07 PM
Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against RIO'S CONCRETE, PUMPING AND RENTAL, INC. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 20, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/21 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant RIO'S CONCRETE, PUMPING AND RENTAL, INC. (Re:6 Motion for Default Against Defendant Rio's Concrete, Pumping And Rental, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Thursday, April 18, 2024
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/18 3:42 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant RIO'S CONCRETE, PUMPING AND RENTAL, INC. Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Against Defendant Rio's Concrete, Pumping And Rental, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
6 6 motion Default Wed 04/17 2:12 PM
Motion for Default Against Defendant Rio's Concrete, Pumping And Rental, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/17 2:10 PM
Notice of Filing Evidence of Receipt of , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01071 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against RIO'S CONCRETE, PUMPING AND RENTAL, INC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit No Monies) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on RIO'S CONCRETE, PUMPING AND RENTAL, INC Answer Due 4/15/2024,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila). Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 3:24 PM
Summons Service Executed on RIO'S CONCRETE, PUMPING AND RENTAL, INC 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant RIO'S CONCRETE, PUMPING AND RENTAL, INC. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 03/15 12:41 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 03/15 12:39 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on RIO'S CONCRETE, PUMPING AND RENTAL, INC Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/14 3:08 PM
Adversary case 24-01071 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against RIO'S CONCRETE, PUMPING AND RENTAL, INC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit No Monies