Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01074
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
RAUDA SERVICES CORP
Represented By
RAUDA SERVICES CORP
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
36 36 misc Subpoena Tue 12/10 5:28 PM
Subpoena of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Executed on December 10th, 2024, Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena-Wells Fargo
Friday, November 15, 2024
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/16 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Notice of Entry (Re:29 Amended Final Judgment in Garnishment. (Re: 23 Judgment). (Valencia, Yamileth) )
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 11/16 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 11/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Amended Final Judgment in Garnishment. (Re: 23 Judgment). (Valencia, Yamileth)
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/16 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Notice of Entry (Re:29 Amended Final Judgment in Garnishment. (Re: 23 Judgment). (Valencia, Yamileth) )
Thursday, November 14, 2024
32 32 misc Certificate of Service Thu 11/14 9:57 AM
Certificate of Service Amended Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 29 Amended Order
31 31 misc Certificate of Service Thu 11/14 9:17 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 29 Amended Order
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
30 30 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Wed 11/13 12:24 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 29 Amended Final Judgment in Garnishment. (Re: 23 Judgment). (Valencia, Yamileth)
29 29 order Amended Order Wed 11/13 12:01 PM
Amended Final Judgment in Garnishment. Related [+]. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 23 Judgment
Sunday, October 27, 2024
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/28 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Entry (Re:23 Final Judgment in Garnishment . (Valencia, Yamileth) ) Notice Date 10/27/2024. (Admin.
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 10/28 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Final Judgment in Garnishment . (Valencia, Yamileth)
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/28 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Entry (Re:23 Final Judgment in Garnishment . (Valencia, Yamileth) ) Notice Date 10/27/2024. (Admin.
Friday, October 25, 2024
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/25 4:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 23 Judgment
24 24 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Fri 10/25 11:50 AM
Notice of Entry Related [+]
Related: [-] 23 Final Judgment in Garnishment . (Valencia, Yamileth) (Valencia, Yamileth
23 23 order Judgment Fri 10/25 11:47 AM
Final Judgment in Garnishment . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Motion Thu 10/24 1:29 PM
Ex Parte Motion For Final Judgment Against Garnishee, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/26 5:14 PM
Certificate of Service Supplemental Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,19 Writ of Garnishment
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/24 10:34 AM
Certificate of Service PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.041 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,19 Writ of Garnishment
Thursday, September 19, 2024
19 19 court Writ of Garnishment Thu 09/19 3:25 PM
COPY OF Writ of Garnishment Related [+] (Original Mailed to Plaintiff on 9/19/24) (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cert. Final Judgment # 2 Exhibit Writ of Garnishment)
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
18 18 motion Writ of Garnishment Application Wed 09/18 11:13 AM
Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Cert. Final Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit Writ of Garnishment
Thursday, May 23, 2024
17 17 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/23 3:19 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1074 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Entry (Re:12 Final Judgment Against Defendant RAUDA SERVICES CORP. (Valencia, Yamileth) )
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Final Judgment Against Defendant RAUDA SERVICES CORP. . (Valencia, Yamileth)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Entry (Re:12 Final Judgment Against Defendant RAUDA SERVICES CORP. (Valencia, Yamileth) )
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
13 13 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Tue 05/07 3:13 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 12 Final Judgment Against Defendant RAUDA SERVICES CORP. (Valencia, Yamileth)
12 12 order Judgment Tue 05/07 3:11 PM
Final Judgment Against Defendant RAUDA SERVICES CORP. . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Default Judgment Order Tue 05/07 3:09 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Final Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] # 10
Thursday, May 02, 2024
10 10 12 pgs motion Default Judgment Thu 05/02 3:22 PM
Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against RAUDA SERVICES CORP. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 20, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/21 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Rauda Services Corp (Re:7 Motion for Default Against Defendant Rauda Services Corp Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Thursday, April 18, 2024
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/18 3:48 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Rauda Services Corp Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Against Defendant Rauda Services Corp Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
7 7 motion Default Wed 04/17 3:23 PM
Motion for Default Against Defendant Rauda Services Corp Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/17 3:22 PM
Notice of Filing Rauda Services Corp , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01074 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against RAUDA SERVICES CORP. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit No Monies) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on RAUDA SERVICES CORP Answer Due 4/15/2024,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila). Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 2:37 PM
Summons Service Executed on RAUDA SERVICES CORP 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant RAUDA SERVICES CORP. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 17, 2024
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/18 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on RAUDA SERVICES CORP Answer Due 4/15/2024
Friday, March 15, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 03/15 12:54 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 03/15 12:53 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on RAUDA SERVICES CORP Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/14 3:26 PM
Adversary case 24-01074 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against RAUDA SERVICES CORP. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit No Monies