Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01075
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
RHL GROUP CONSTRUCTION CORP
Represented By
RHL GROUP CONSTRUCTION CORP
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, September 23, 2024
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/23 4:31 PM
Certificate of Service PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.041 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Truist Bank filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,19 Writ of Garnishment
Thursday, September 19, 2024
19 19 court Writ of Garnishment Thu 09/19 3:27 PM
COPY OF Writ of Garnishment Related [+] (Original Mailed to Plaintiff on 9/19/24) (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Truist Bank Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cert. Final Judgment # 2 Exhibit Writ of Garnishment) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
18 18 motion Writ of Garnishment Application Wed 09/18 11:20 AM
Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Truist Bank Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Cert. Final Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit Writ of Garnishment
Thursday, May 23, 2024
17 17 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/23 3:17 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1075 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Entry (Re:12 Final Judgment Against RHL GROUP CONSTRUCTION CORP. (Valencia, Yamileth) )
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Final Judgment Against RHL GROUP CONSTRUCTION CORP. (Valencia, Yamileth)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Entry (Re:12 Final Judgment Against RHL GROUP CONSTRUCTION CORP. (Valencia, Yamileth) )
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
13 13 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Tue 05/07 3:28 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 12 Final Judgment Against RHL GROUP CONSTRUCTION CORP. (Valencia, Yamileth)
12 12 order Judgment Tue 05/07 3:25 PM
Final Judgment Against RHL GROUP CONSTRUCTION CORP. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Default Judgment Order Tue 05/07 3:18 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Final Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] # 10
Thursday, May 02, 2024
10 10 10 pgs motion Default Judgment Thu 05/02 3:29 PM
Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against RHL GROUP CONSTRUCTION CORP. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 20, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/21 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant RHL Group Construction Corp (Re:7 Motion for Default Against Defendant RHL Group Construction Corp Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Thursday, April 18, 2024
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/18 3:52 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant RHL Group Construction Corp Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Against Defendant RHL Group Construction Corp Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
7 7 motion Default Wed 04/17 2:05 PM
Motion for Default Against Defendant RHL Group Construction Corp Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/17 2:03 PM
Notice of Filing Evidence of Receipt of , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01075 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against RHL GROUP CONSTRUCTION CORP. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit No Monies) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on RHL GROUP CONSTRUCTION CORP Answer Due 4/15/2024,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila). Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 3:29 PM
Summons Service Executed on RHL GROUP CONSTRUCTION CORP 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant RHL GROUP CONSTRUCTION CORP. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 17, 2024
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/18 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on RHL GROUP CONSTRUCTION CORP Answer Due 4/15/2024
Friday, March 15, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 03/15 1:03 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 03/15 1:02 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on RHL GROUP CONSTRUCTION CORP Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/14 3:30 PM
Adversary case 24-01075 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against RHL GROUP CONSTRUCTION CORP. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit No Monies