Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01076
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Terminated:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
SIXTO E MUNOZ
Represented By
SIXTO E MUNOZ
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, October 03, 2024
23 23 court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/03 10:18 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1076 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/19 6:11 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 20 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/19 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Leonard, Jahshima)
Monday, September 16, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Mon 09/16 3:21 PM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Leonard, Jahshima)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Fri 09/13 8:42 AM
Joint Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Examination Wed 09/04 9:17 AM
Renewed Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of Sixto E. Munoz on September 16th, 2024 at 10:00 A.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
17 17 answer Objection Fri 07/19 7:01 PM
Limited Objection to (12 Notice of Examination filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) (Objection to Duces Tecum Request for Production Item "E" Only) Filed by Defendant SIXTO E MUNOZ (Schwitalla, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
16 16 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Wed 07/10 2:40 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/09 4:47 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
14 14 order Continue Hearing Order Tue 07/09 11:31 AM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference Re: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/12/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
13 13 motion Continue Hearing Mon 07/08 4:09 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Examination Mon 07/08 4:01 PM
First Notice of Taking Examination Duces Tecum of Sixto Munoz on September 11th, 2024 at 10:00 A.M. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
11 11 answer Response Mon 06/24 5:00 PM
Response to (10 Request for Admissions filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Filed by Defendant SIXTO E MUNOZ (Schwitalla, James)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Request for Admissions Mon 06/24 2:29 PM
Trustee Kapila's First Set of Interrogatories, First Requests for Production and First Request for Admissions Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/01 4:23 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Monday, April 29, 2024
8 8 order Continue Hearing Order Mon 04/29 1:41 PM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Agreed First Motion To Continue Scheduling Conference On: ( 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 09/12/2024 at 02:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
7 7 motion Continue Hearing Thu 04/25 3:07 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/15 6:05 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by SIXTO E MUNOZ. (Schwitalla, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/12 3:02 PM
Amended Complaint by Soneet Kapila against SIXTO E MUNOZ. Complaint Amended to To correct Scrivener's error.. Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01076 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against SIXTO E MUNOZ. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Non-Mili # 2 Affidavit No Monies) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 2:46 PM
Summons Service Executed on SIXTO E MUNOZ 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant SIXTO E MUNOZ. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 03/15 1:06 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 03/15 1:05 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on SIXTO E MUNOZ Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/14 4:01 PM
Adversary case 24-01076 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against SIXTO E MUNOZ. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Non-Mili
Att: 2 Affidavit No Monies