Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01077
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
MORO CONCRETE LLC
Represented By
MORO CONCRETE LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
19 West Flagler Street Suite 416
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
James B Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Nonappearance Tue 03/11 11:02 AM
Notice of Nonappearance of Moro Concrete, Inc. (Corporate Representative) Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 23 Subpoena of Moro Concrete, LLC, Executed on December 5th, 2024, Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
24 24 misc Subpoena Wed 12/11 8:54 AM
Subpoena of Bank of America, Executed on December 10th, 2024, Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena-Bank of America
Thursday, December 05, 2024
23 23 misc Subpoena Thu 12/05 4:45 PM
Subpoena of Moro Concrete, LLC, Executed on December 5th, 2024, Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Filing Mon 10/21 2:49 PM
Notice of Filing NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.055 , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 21 Answer to (19 Writ of Garnishment) Filed by Other Professional Bank of America, N.A. filed by Other Professional Bank of America, N.A.
Thursday, October 03, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Writ of Garnishment Thu 10/03 4:16 PM
Answer to (19 Writ of Garnishment) Filed by Other Professional Bank of America, N.A. (Noa, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/24 10:26 AM
Certificate of Service PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES §77.041 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Bank Of America, N.A. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,19 Writ of Garnishment
Thursday, September 19, 2024
19 19 court Writ of Garnishment Thu 09/19 3:28 PM
COPY OF Writ of Garnishment Related [+] (Original Mailed to Plaintiff on 9/19/24) (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Bank Of America, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cert. Final Judgment # 2 Exhibit Writ of Garnishment) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
18 18 motion Writ of Garnishment Application Wed 09/18 11:02 AM
Motion for Writ of Garnishment To Bank Of America, N.A. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Cert. Final Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit Writ of Garnishment
Thursday, May 23, 2024
17 17 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/23 3:15 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1077 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Judgment Against Defendant MORO CONCRETE LLC. (Valencia, Yamileth) )
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Final Judgment Against Defendant MORO CONCRETE LLC. (Valencia, Yamileth)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Granting Motion For Default Final Judgment (Re: 9 ) (Valencia, Yamileth)
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Judgment Against Defendant MORO CONCRETE LLC. (Valencia, Yamileth) )
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
12 12 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Tue 05/07 3:38 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 11 Final Judgment Against Defendant MORO CONCRETE LLC. (Valencia, Yamileth)
11 11 order Judgment Tue 05/07 3:33 PM
Final Judgment Against Defendant MORO CONCRETE LLC. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Default Judgment Order Tue 05/07 3:31 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Final Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] # 9
Thursday, May 02, 2024
9 9 motion Default Judgment Thu 05/02 3:51 PM
Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against MORO CONCRETE LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 20, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/21 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Moro Concrete LLC (Re:6 Motion for Default Against Defendant Moro Concrete LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Thursday, April 18, 2024
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/18 3:54 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Moro Concrete LLC Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Against Defendant Moro Concrete LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
6 6 motion Default Wed 04/17 2:57 PM
Motion for Default Against Defendant Moro Concrete LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/17 2:56 PM
Notice of Filing Evidence of Receipt of , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Miller, James)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01077 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against MORO CONCRETE LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit No Monies) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on MORO CONCRETE LLC Answer Due 4/15/2024,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila). Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 2:52 PM
Summons Service Executed on MORO CONCRETE LLC 3/18/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila, Defendant MORO CONCRETE LLC. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 03/15 1:09 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 03/15 1:08 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on MORO CONCRETE LLC Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/14 4:18 PM
Adversary case 24-01077 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against MORO CONCRETE LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit No Monies