Seaton Investments, LLC and Susan Halevy
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Vincent P Zurzolo |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-12079 |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Seaton Investments, LLC
440 Seaton St
Los Angeles, CA 90013-2545 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
48 | 48
misc
Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference
Thu 04/25 11:01 PM
Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference Debtors Chapter 11 Status Report; Declarations of Alan Gomperts, Derrick Talerico and Zev Shechtman in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC. (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
47 | 47
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Wed 04/24 10:29 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other: CORRECTION: Incorrect caption page - Case Jointly Administered - - THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (TJ) |
|
46 | 46
misc
Declaration
Wed 04/24 11:04 AM
Declaration re: Declaration that No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion LBR 9013-1(o)(3) Filed by Debtors Susan Halevy, Daniel Halevy, Alan Gomperts . (Falk, Turner) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR)
Mon 04/22 10:40 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 2:24-bk-12091-VZ for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC. (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Page; Attachments; Proof of Service | ||
44 | 44
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR)
Mon 04/22 10:38 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 2:24-bk-12082-VZ for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC. (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Page; Attachments; Proof of Service | ||
43 | 43
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR)
Mon 04/22 10:36 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 2:24-bk-12081-VZ for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC. (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Page; Attachments; Proof of Service | ||
42 | 42
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR)
Mon 04/22 10:34 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 2:24-bk-12080-VZ for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC. (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Page, Attachments, Proof of Service | ||
41 | 41
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR)
Mon 04/22 10:28 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC. (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Page, Attachments, Proof of Service | ||
40 | 40
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Mon 04/22 9:34 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Notice of Mismatch between filed document and docket event. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE.. (TJ) |
|
39 | 39
notice
Notice
Mon 04/22 7:27 PM
Notice Notice of Application of Corporate Chapter 11 Debtors and Debtors In Possession to Employ Weintraub Zolkin Talerico & Selth LLP, as General Bankruptcy Counsel Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC . (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
38 | 38
misc
Withdrawal re:
Mon 04/22 7:25 PM
Withdrawal re: Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Application of Corporate Chapter 11 Debtors and Debtors In Possession to Employ Weintraub Zolkin Talerico & Selth LLP, as General Bankruptcy Counsel [Dkt. No. 36] Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC . (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
37 | 37
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Mon 04/22 7:52 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Notice of Mismatch between filed document and docket event. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL USING WITHDRAWAL DOCKET EVENT AND REFILE THE DOCUMENT USING THE CORRECT DOCKET EVENT THAT MATCHES THE DOCUMENT. (TJ) |
|
Saturday, April 20, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o))
Sat 04/20 1:17 AM
Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)) Notice of Application of Corporate Chapter 11 Debtors and Debtors In Possession to Employ Weintraub Zolkin Talerico & Selth LLP, as General Bankruptcy Counsel Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC . (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Employ (motion)
Sat 04/20 1:14 AM
Application to Employ Weintraub Zolkin Talerico & Selth LLP as General Bankruptcy Counsel to Corporate Debtors Application of Corporate Chapter 11 Debtors and Debtors In Possession to Employ Weintraub Zolkin Talerico & Selth LLP, as General Bankruptcy Counsel; Declaration of Derrick Talerico in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Fri 04/19 8:36 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Falk, Turner. (Falk, Turner) |
|
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sun 04/14 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
order
Non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule (BNC-PDF)
Fri 04/12 12:35 PM
Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney Turner N. Falk to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/12/2024 (SM2) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Amended List of Creditors (Fee)
Wed 04/10 12:09 AM
Amendment to List of Creditors. Fee Amount $34 Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC. (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
30 | 30
33
pgs
misc
Corp Resolution Auth Filing
Wed 04/10 12:06 AM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , List of Equity Security Holders , Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC . (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 04/10 12:15 AM
Receipt of Amended List of Creditors (Fee)([LINK:2:24-bk-12079-VZ] ) [misc,amdcm] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56719577. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule (motion)
Tue 04/09 6:05 PM
Application of non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule (Turner N. Falk) Filed by Debtors Alan Gomperts, Daniel Halevy, Susan Halevy (Shechtman, Zev) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Withdrawal re:
Tue 04/09 6:00 PM
Withdrawal re: Notice of Withdrawal And Refiling of Application of Non-Resident Attorney To Appear In A Specific Case [LBR 2090-1(b)] Filed by Debtors Alan Gomperts, Daniel Halevy, Susan Halevy . (Shechtman, Zev) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Mon 04/08 1:01 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Notice of Mismatch between filed document and docket event. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL USING WITHDRAWAL DOCKET EVENT AND REFILE THE DOCUMENT USING THE CORRECT DOCKET EVENT THAT MATCHES THE DOCUMENT. Other: CORRECTION: Incorrect formatting of case number(s) and Name(s) on PDF- Case Jointly Administered - (TJ) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Appear pro hac vice (motion)
Mon 04/08 12:22 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear In A Specific Case [LBR 2090-1(b)] (Turner N. Falk) Filed by Debtors Alan Gomperts, Daniel Halevy, Susan Halevy (Shechtman, Zev) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice
Mon 04/08 10:03 AM
Notice Notice of Joint Administration of Cases and Requirements for Filing Documents Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC . (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
Saturday, April 06, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 04/06 9:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/06/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
28
pgs
motion
Employ (motion)
Fri 04/05 12:39 PM
Application to Employ Saul Ewing LLP as General Bankruptcy Counsel ; Statement of Disinterestedness Filed by Debtors Susan Halevy, Daniel Halevy, Alan Gomperts (Shechtman, Zev) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Thu 04/04 12:17 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Garan, Todd. (Garan, Todd) |
|
21 | 21
order
Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (BNC-PDF)
Thu 04/04 11:45 AM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information, and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/4/2024. (SC2) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 04/03 9:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/03/2024. (Admin.) |
|
19 | 19
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Wed 04/03 5:42 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other: CORRECTION: Incomplete caption page - THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (TJ) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (motion)
Wed 04/03 3:49 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information, and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents) Debtors Motion to Extend Time to File Case Opening Documents Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Mon 04/01 5:43 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on behalf of Harvest Small Business Finance, LLC Filed by James, Jacqueline. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
16 | 16
order
Joint Administration (BNC-PDF)
Mon 04/01 3:34 PM
Order Granting Debtor's motion to approve joint administration of cases; ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; jointly administrated with case numbers - 2:24-bk-12074-VZ; 2:24-bk-12075-VZ; 2:24-bk-18076-VZ; 2:24-bk-12080-VZ; 2:24-bk-12081-VZ; 2:24-bk-12082-VZ; 2:24-bk-12091-VZ "for additional information refer to image" (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/1/2024. (TJ) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Fri 03/29 1:57 AM
Notice of lodgment of Order in Bankruptcy Case Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC . (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
Saturday, March 23, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 03/23 9:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/23/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Declaration
Fri 03/22 11:59 AM
Declaration re: Notice of Declarations of Martha E. Araki, Sachie Fritz and Yerika Ramirez Regarding Provision of Telephonic Notice and Service of Debtors Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC . (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
12 | 12
6
pgs
answer
Objection
Fri 03/22 11:04 AM
Objection Limited Objection to Debtors Motion for Joint Administration with Proof of Service Filed by Creditor Korth Direct Mortgage Inc. (Behnam, Tanya) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Thu 03/21 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 03/21 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 03/21 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 03/21 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 14. Notice Date 03/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Thu 03/21 4:35 PM
Order: (1) Setting Conference on Status of Reorganization Case; (2) Requiring Debtor-in Possession to Appear at Status Conference And File Report on Status of Reorganization Case, or Face Possible (A) Conversion of Case to Chapter 7; (B) Dismissal of Case; or (c) Appointment of Trustee; (3) Requiring Compliance With Standards Re Employment And Fee Applications; (4) Giving Notice of Probable Use of Court-Appointed Expert Witness For Contested Valuation Requests; (5) Mandating Use of Forms For Disclosure Statement And Plan; And (6) Establishing Procedure For (A) Motion For Order Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement; And (B) Motion For Order Confirming Plan (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/21/2024 (SC2) |
|
court
Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Thu 03/21 4:50 PM
Hearing Set Hearing to be held on 05/09/2024 at 10:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1368 Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Vincent Zurzolo (NV) |
||
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Wed 03/20 5:46 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Behnam, Tanya. (Behnam, Tanya) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK Case)
Wed 03/20 11:27 AM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Motion for Debtors Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC . (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
4 | 4
19
pgs
motion
Joint Administration (motion)
Wed 03/20 11:25 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Debtors Motion for Joint Administration; Declaration of Alan D. Gomperts in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor Seaton Investments, LLC (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
court
Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Wed 03/20 12:18 PM
Hearing Set Hearing to be held on 03/25/2024 at 11:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1368 Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Vincent Zurzolo (NV) |
||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Tue 03/19 5:42 PM
Order Setting Hearing(s) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/19/2024 (NV) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Tue 03/19 2:25 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/3/2024 at 09:00 AM at UST-LA3, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-811-2961, PARTICIPANT CODE:9609127. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/2/2024. (LL2) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 03/19 7:20 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Seaton Investments, LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 04/2/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 04/2/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 04/2/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 04/2/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 04/2/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 04/2/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 04/2/2024. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 04/2/2024. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 04/2/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 04/2/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 04/2/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 04/2/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 04/2/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 04/2/2024. (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 03/19 7:23 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:24-bk-12079] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56627857. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |