Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:24-bk-10303
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2024

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Hot Crete LLC
2010 Brushy Creek Road Unit A
Cedar Park, TX 78613
Represented By
Todd Brice Headden
Hayward PLLC
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 05, 2024 6:22 AM CST
Creditor
The County of Williamson, Texas
P.O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Julie A. Parsons
Mccreary Veselka Bragg & Allen PC
contact info
Creditor
Spark Root Construction, LLC
6700 Bridge Root Cove
Austin, TX 78746
Represented By
Brian C. Guequierre
The Law Offices Of Brian C. Guequierre
contact info
Creditor
Jeremy Spicer
Represented By
Michael P. Ridulfo
Kane Russell Coleman Logan
contact info
Creditor
Diego Suarez
5466 Ergill
San Antonio, TX 78227
Represented By
Stephanie Elaine Kaiser
Dickinson Wright Pplc
contact info
Creditor
Elaine Suarez
Represented By
Stephanie Elaine Kaiser
Dickinson Wright Pplc
contact info
Creditor
Sumitomo Mitsui Finance and Leasing Co. Ltd.
201 Old Country Road Suite 120
Melville, NY 11747
Represented By
Matthew F Kye
Kye Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Sumitomo Mitsui Finance and Leasing Company, Limited
6420 Wellington Pl
Beaumont, TX 77706
Represented By
James W. King
Offerman And King, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Heather Szastak
CAIN & SKARNULIS PLLC c/o Michael Moody 303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Michael D. Moody
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Jeffrey Szastak
CAIN & SKARNULIS PLLC c/o Michael Moody 303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Michael D. Moody
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Elizabeth Spicer
Represented By
Michael P. Ridulfo
Kane Russell Coleman Logan
contact info
Creditor
Trans Lease, Inc.
Padfield & Stout, LLP Jessica N. Alt 420 Throckmorton Street, Suite 1210
Fort Worth, TX 76102
Represented By
Jessica Nicole Alt
Padfield & Stout, LLP
contact info
Matthew Bryce Fronda
Padfield & Stout, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Edward Weltens
CAIN & SKARNULIS PLLC c/o Michael Moody 303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Michael D. Moody
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Julie Weltens
CAIN & SKARNULIS PLLC c/o Michael Moody 303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Michael D. Moody
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Westbrook
812 Silver Trail
Round Rock, TX 78664
Represented By
Abigail Ventress
Vbpena Law
contact info
Creditor
Brad Wheeler
Holland & Knight, LLP 100 Congress Avenue Suite 1800
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
William R Nix, III
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Creditor
Kevin Wilson
901 Mopac Expwy South Bldg 1, Ste 300
Austin, TX 78746
Represented By
Marvin E. Sprouse, III
Sprouse Law Firm
contact info
Creditor
Donn Wurts
CAIN & SKARNULIS PLLC c/o Michael Moody 303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Michael D. Moody
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Jamie Wurts
CAIN & SKARNULIS PLLC c/o Michael Moody 303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Michael D. Moody
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Nick Russell
CAIN & SKARNULIS PLLC c/o Michael Moody 303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Michael D. Moody
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Arcosa Aggregates Texas, LLC
Represented By
Frances A. Smith
Ross, Smith & Binford, PC
contact info
Creditor
Cody Pools, Inc.
Represented By
Frank B. Lyon
Frank B. Lyon, Attorney
contact info
Creditor
Frost Bank
Luttrell + Carmody Law Group 100 NE Loop 410, Suite 615
San Antonio, TX 78216
Represented By
Morris Eugene White, III
Villa & White LLP
contact info
Leslie M. Luttrell
Luttrell + Carmody Law Group
contact info
Jessica Ann Henry
Luttrell Carmody Law Group
contact info
Creditor
Rowena Hernandez
CAIN & SKARNULIS PLLC c/o Michael Moody 303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Michael D. Moody
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Melissa Jordan
CAIN & SKARNULIS PLLC c/o Michael Moody 303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Michael D. Moody
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Jarratt Wade Landers
CAIN & SKARNULIS PLLC c/o Michael Moody 303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Michael D. Moody
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Patricia Landers
CAIN & SKARNULIS PLLC c/o Michael Moody 303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Michael D. Moody
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Wade Landers
CAIN & SKARNULIS PLLC c/o Michael Moody 303 Colorado Street, Suite 2850
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Michael D. Moody
Cain & Skarnulis PLLC
contact info
Creditor
James Murdock
Holland & Knight, LLP 100 Congress Avenue Suite 1800
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
William R Nix, III
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jason Nichol
Holland & Knight, LLP 100 Congress Avenue Suite 1800
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
William R Nix, III
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Creditor
North Mill Credit Trust
100 Throckmorton Street, Suite 700
Fort Worth, TX 76102
Represented By
Ivan Escobar Gomez
Padfield & Stout, LLP
contact info
Christopher V. Arisco
Padfield & Stout, LLP
contact info
Jessica Nicole Alt
Padfield & Stout, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Guillermo Ochoa-Cronfel
The Cronfel Firm 1409 Laurel Glen Blvd.
Leander, TX 78641
Represented By
Guillermo Ochoa-Cronfel
Cronfelfirm
contact info
Creditor
Pools By Blue Haven, Inc.
Represented By
B. Weldon Ponder, Jr.
contact info
Creditor
Doo Reid
1409 Laurel Glen Blvd.
Leander, TX 78641
Represented By
Guillermo Ochoa-Cronfel
Cronfelfirm
contact info
Creditor
Southpaw Pools, Inc.
200 County Road
Florence, TX 76527
Represented By
Daniel Schick
Germer PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
Terra Point LLC
2802 Flintrock Trace Suite #284
Austin, TX 78738
Interested Party
Royston Rayzor Vickery & Williams LLP
Fountainhead Tower 8200 IH 10 W #504
San Antonio, TX 78230
Interested Party
Rose Wheeler
Attn.: Bankruptcy Department 1200 Smith Street, Suite 1400
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Tara T. LeDay
Chamberlain Hrdlicka White Williams
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - AU12
United States Trustee 903 San Jacinto Blvd, Suite 230
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Jessica Lanoue Hanzlik
United States Trustee Program
contact info
Gary W. Wright
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
203 203 misc ~Document Wed 04/30 3:29 PM
Notice of Change of Address filed by Jon Michael Smith for Creditor Vaseem Syed. (Smith, Jon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
202 202 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/24 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 200 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (Related Document(s):199 Disclosure Statement filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Hot Crete LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Liquidating Plan)) Hearing Scheduled For 6/5/2025 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 1 ... Five calendar days before the hearing, exhibits must be: (1) mailed to U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Attn: Jennifer Lopez, Homer Thornberry Judicial Bldg., 903 San Jacinto, Suite 322, Austin, TX 78701 and (2) emailed to Adam Schmit at Adam_Schmit@txwb.uscourts.gov, Juliana Steward at Juliana_Steward@txwb.uscourts.gov AND Jennifer Lopez at jennifer_lopez@txwb.uscourts.gov.... If the parties anticipate that 30 minutes is not enough time for all sides to present argument and evidence for their matter, the parties must file a motion requesting a special setting.
201 201 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Thu 04/24 12:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Timothy W. Brink for Creditor Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company. (Brink, Timothy)
Related: [-]