Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12103

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Corali Lopez-Castro
Case #: 1:24-ap-01175
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2024
Terminated:Jul 08, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sunshine Pools & Contracting Group, Inc.
13995 SW 144th Ave., Suite 208
Miami, FL 33186
Represented By
Sunshine Pools & Contracting Group, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Marelys Torres Abreu
801 Brickell Ave 8th floor
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Yamila Lorenzo
contact info
Ryan M Clancy
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, July 11, 2024
11 11 court Notification of Returned Mail Thu 07/11 3:31 PM
Notification of Returned Mail. The attached notices (ECF #5 and #6) mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Gonzalez, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
10 10 court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/08 9:03 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1175 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Gutierrez, Susan)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 23, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 06/24 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Entry (Re:5 Agreed Final Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Marelys Torres Abreu Against Defendant Sunshine Pool & Contracting Group, Inc. . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) )
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 06/24 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 06/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Agreed Final Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Marelys Torres Abreu Against Defendant Sunshine Pool & Contracting Group, Inc. . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 06/24 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Entry (Re:5 Agreed Final Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Marelys Torres Abreu Against Defendant Sunshine Pool & Contracting Group, Inc. . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) )
Friday, June 21, 2024
6 6 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Fri 06/21 8:36 AM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 5 Agreed Final Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Marelys Torres Abreu Against Defendant Sunshine Pool & Contracting Group, Inc. . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
5 5 order Judgment Fri 06/21 8:35 AM
Agreed Final Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Marelys Torres Abreu Against Defendant Sunshine Pool & Contracting Group, Inc. . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Fri 06/14 3:17 PM
Notice of Filing Proposed Agreed Final Judgment , Filed by Plaintiff Marelys Torres Abreu.(Lorenzo, Yamila) Modified on 6/17/2024 to Edit Text. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Agreed Final Judgment
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 03/27 8:33 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/15/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (CLC), Miami, FL 33128. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marelys Torres Abreu
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 03/27 8:30 AM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Sunshine Pools & Contracting Group, Inc. Answer Due 4/26/2024 (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/26 11:52 AM
Adversary case 24-01175 Complaint by MARELYS TORRES ABREU against Sunshine Pools & Contracting Group, Inc.. Nature of Suit:,(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Clancy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - FIRST PROPOSAL
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B - LETTER
Att: 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C - SECOND PROPOSAL
Att: 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D - TEXT MESSAGES
Att: 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E - PERMIT AND INSPECTION HISTORY
Att: 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT F - CLAIM OF LIEN