Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 8:24-bk-80040
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2024
Creditor Meeting:May 13, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Eiger BioPharmaceuticals, Inc.
2155 Park Blvd
Palo Alto, CA 94306-1543
Represented By
Nathan Elner
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
John Joseph Kuster
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jon Muenz
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Veronica A. Courtney
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
William E Curtin
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Thomas Robert Califano
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Patrick J. Neligan, Jr.
Neligan LLP
contact info
Anne G. Wallice
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Charles Martin Persons, Jr.
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Unsecured Creditors Committee
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. 500 N. Akard Street Suite 4000
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Michael S. Budwick
Meland Budwick, P.A.
contact info
Meaghan E. Murphy
Meland Budwick, P.A.
contact info
Shira A. Baratz
Meland Budwick, P.A.
contact info
Thomas Daniel Berghman
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr PC
contact info
Daniel N. Gonzalez
Meland Budwick, PA
contact info
Garrick Chase Smith
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202
Represented By
Elizabeth Ziegler Young
U.S. Trustee Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
870 870 motion Extend/Shorten time Wed 05/07 2:36 PM
Motion to extend time to Object to Claims Filed by Interested Party Dundon Advisers, LLC, as Eiger Liquidating Trustee Objections due by 5/31/2025. (Venus, S.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order
869 869 notice Notice of hearing Wed 05/07 12:59 PM
Notice of hearing / Notice of Status Conference filed by Interested Party Dundon Advisers, LLC, as Eiger Liquidating Trustee. Hearing to be held on 5/12/2025 at 02:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/jerniga (Venus, S.)
Related: [-]
868 868 misc Certificate of no objection Wed 05/07 11:45 AM
Certificate of no objection filed by Interested Party Dundon Advisers, LLC, as Eiger Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Venus, S.)
Related: [-] 761 Objection to claim
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Sunday, May 04, 2025
867 867 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sun 05/04 11:17 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 866 Joint stipulation and agreed order (RE: related document(s)834 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Interested Party Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc.,835 Sealed motion per court order filed by Interested Party Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc.). Entered on 5/2/2025
Friday, May 02, 2025
866 866 28 pgs order Order (generic) Fri 05/02 10:19 AM
Joint stipulation and agreed order Related [+]. Entered on 5/2/2025 (Rielly, Bill)
Related: [-] 834 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Interested Party Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc.,835 Sealed motion per court order filed by Interested Party Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc.
865 865 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 05/02 6:47 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80044 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 for EigerBio Europe Limited filed by Debtor Eiger BioPharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Califano, Thomas)
Related: [-]
864 864 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 05/02 6:46 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80043 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 for Eiger BioPharmaceuticals Europe Limited filed by Debtor Eiger BioPharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Califano, Thomas)
Related: [-]
863 863 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 05/02 6:44 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80041 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 for EBPI Merger Inc. filed by Debtor Eiger BioPharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Califano, Thomas)
Related: [-]
862 862 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 05/02 6:42 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 24-80042 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 for EB Pharma LLC filed by Debtor Eiger BioPharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Califano, Thomas)
Related: [-]
861 861 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 05/02 6:40 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 for Eiger BioPharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Debtor Eiger BioPharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Califano, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
860 860 court Clerk's correspondence Thu 05/01 4:47 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting that Stipulation and Agreed order is uploaded for Judge's signature. Related [+] Responses due by 5/15/2025. (Okafor, M.)
Related: [-] 858 Stipulation by EIT Pharma, Inc., formerly known as Eiger InnoTherapeutics, Inc. and Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc.. filed by Interested Party EIT Pharma, Inc., formerly known as Eiger InnoTherapeutics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)834 Motion for preliminary injunction Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc.'s Expedited Motion for Interim Equitable Relief (REDACTED) ,835 SEALED Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc.'s Expedited Motion for Interim Equitable Relief per court order ).
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
859 859 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Wed 04/30 11:18 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 847 Order granting motion for order authorizing remote testimony by declarant at hearing on expedited motion for interim equitable relief (related document837 ) Entered on 4/28/2025.
858 858 misc Stipulation Wed 04/30 8:08 PM
Stipulation by EIT Pharma, Inc., formerly known as Eiger InnoTherapeutics, Inc. and Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc.. filed by Interested Party EIT Pharma, Inc., formerly known as Eiger InnoTherapeutics, Inc. Related [+]. (Brookner, Jason)
Related: [-] 834 Motion for preliminary injunction Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc.'s Expedited Motion for Interim Equitable Relief (REDACTED) ,835 SEALED Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc.'s Expedited Motion for Interim Equitable Relief per court order
857 857 court Sealed Transcript Wed 04/30 10:42 AM
SEALED Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/29/2025 before Judge Stacey G.C. Jernigan RE: Motions (SEALED Proceedings, 10:07 am-11:52 am, 73 pages). Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. Related [+]
Related: [-] 852 Hearing held on 4/29/2025. (RE: related document(s)729 Application for administrative expenses Motion for Allowance of Administrative Expense Claim of Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc., filed by Interested Party Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc. (Appearances: H. Ray, J. Morris, and M. Stromberg for Sentynyl; J. Brookner and E. Shanks for EIT; R. Parisi and M. Venus for Liquidating Trustee. Nonevidenitary hearing (this was a hearing on motion for summary judgment only). Motion for summary judgment denied. Matter is set for trial on May 28-29, 2025. Order will be submitted.), 853 Hearing held on 4/29/2025. (RE: related document(s)787 Emergency Motion to enforce EIT Pharma, Inc., formerly known as Eiger InnoTherapeutics, Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Confirm Terms of Lonafarnib/Lambda Sale Order (related document(s):558 Order on motion to sell) Filed by Interested Party EIT Pharma, Inc., formerly known as Eiger InnoTherapeutics, Inc.) (Matter is set for May 28-29, 2025), 854 Hearing held on 4/29/2025. (RE: related document(s)833 Expedited Motion to file document under seal, filed by Interested Party Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc. (Appearances: H. Ray, J. Morris, and M. Stromberg for Sentynyl; J. Brookner and E. Shanks for EIT; R. Parisi and M. Venus for Liquidating Trustee. Nonevidenitary hearing. The court will seal hearing only regarding the MSJ on Sentynyl administrative expense claim and related discovery discussion. Hearing will not be sealed as to DE # 834.), 855 Hearing held on 4/29/2025. (RE: related document(s)834 Motion for preliminary injunction Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc.'s Expedited Motion for Interim Equitable Relief (REDACTED) filed by Interested Party Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc. (Appearances: H. Ray, J. Morris, and M. Stromberg for Sentynyl; J. Brookner and E. Shanks for EIT; R. Parisi and M. Venus for Liquidating Trustee. Nonevidenitary hearing. Announcement of the terms of an Agreed Order accepted into the record. Order will be submitted.)). (Rehling, Kathy
856 856 court Transcript Wed 04/30 9:51 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/29/2025 before Judge Stacey G.C. Jernigan RE: Motions (Open Court Proceedings, 11:59 am-12:21 pm, 19 pages). THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 07/29/2025. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. Related [+]
Related: [-] 852 Hearing held on 4/29/2025. (RE: related document(s)729 Application for administrative expenses Motion for Allowance of Administrative Expense Claim of Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc., filed by Interested Party Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc. (Appearances: H. Ray, J. Morris, and M. Stromberg for Sentynyl; J. Brookner and E. Shanks for EIT; R. Parisi and M. Venus for Liquidating Trustee. Nonevidenitary hearing (this was a hearing on motion for summary judgment only). Motion for summary judgment denied. Matter is set for trial on May 28-29, 2025. Order will be submitted.), 853 Hearing held on 4/29/2025. (RE: related document(s)787 Emergency Motion to enforce EIT Pharma, Inc., formerly known as Eiger InnoTherapeutics, Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Confirm Terms of Lonafarnib/Lambda Sale Order (related document(s):558 Order on motion to sell) Filed by Interested Party EIT Pharma, Inc., formerly known as Eiger InnoTherapeutics, Inc.) (Matter is set for May 28-29, 2025), 854 Hearing held on 4/29/2025. (RE: related document(s)833 Expedited Motion to file document under seal, filed by Interested Party Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc. (Appearances: H. Ray, J. Morris, and M. Stromberg for Sentynyl; J. Brookner and E. Shanks for EIT; R. Parisi and M. Venus for Liquidating Trustee. Nonevidenitary hearing. The court will seal hearing only regarding the MSJ on Sentynyl administrative expense claim and related discovery discussion. Hearing will not be sealed as to DE # 834.), 855 Hearing held on 4/29/2025. (RE: related document(s)834 Motion for preliminary injunction Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc.'s Expedited Motion for Interim Equitable Relief (REDACTED) filed by Interested Party Sentynl Therapeutics, Inc. (Appearances: H. Ray, J. Morris, and M. Stromberg for Sentynyl; J. Brookner and E. Shanks for EIT; R. Parisi and M. Venus for Liquidating Trustee. Nonevidenitary hearing. Announcement of the terms of an Agreed Order accepted into the record. Order will be submitted.)). Transcript to be made available to the public on 07/29/2025. (Rehling, Kathy