Member Case
Lead case is: 8:24-bk-80040

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 8:24-bk-80041
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
EBPI Merger Inc.
2155 Park Blvd
Palo Alto, CA 94306-1543
Represented By
Thomas Robert Califano
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago
Monday, May 13, 2024
court Meeting of creditors held Mon 05/13 4:56 PM
Trustee's initial report of meeting of creditors held on 5/13/2024 Related [+] (Young, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 6 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11
Monday, May 06, 2024
10 10 misc Schedules Mon 05/06 11:43 PM
Schedules: Schedules A-B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor EBPI Merger Inc. Related [+]. (Califano, Thomas)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency
9 9 misc Statement of financial affairs Mon 05/06 11:21 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual Statement of Financial Affairs of Debtor EBPI Merger Inc. (Case No. 24-80041 . Filed by Debtor EBPI Merger Inc. Related [+]. (Califano, Thomas)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency
Sunday, April 07, 2024
8 8 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Sun 04/07 11:16 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/13/2024 at 01:30 PM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 8/12/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/30/2024.
Friday, April 05, 2024
7 7 order Joint administration Fri 04/05 10:10 AM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 8:24-bk-80040 with member case 8:24-bk-80041 Related [+] Entered on 4/5/2024. (Rielly, Bill)
Related: [-] 2
Thursday, April 04, 2024
6 6 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Thu 04/04 10:27 AM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/13/2024 at 01:30 PM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 8/12/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/30/2024. (Young, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
5 5 court BNC certificate of mailing Wed 04/03 11:26 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 4/15/2024. Schedule D due 4/15/2024. Schedule E/F due 4/15/2024. Schedule G due 4/15/2024. Schedule H due 4/15/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 4/15/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 4/15/2024. Declaration for electronic filing due within 7 days from date of petition. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/15/2024. Creditor matrix due 4/3/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 4/3/2024. (Ecker, C.)
Monday, April 01, 2024
3 3 court Notice of deficiency Mon 04/01 1:19 PM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 4/15/2024. Schedule D due 4/15/2024. Schedule E/F due 4/15/2024. Schedule G due 4/15/2024. Schedule H due 4/15/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 4/15/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 4/15/2024. Declaration for electronic filing due within 7 days from date of petition. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/15/2024. Creditor matrix due 4/3/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 4/3/2024. (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint administration Mon 04/01 12:35 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases 24-80040 (SGJ); 24-80041 (SGJ); 24-80042 (SGJ); 24-80043 (SGJ); 24-80044 (SGJ) Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor EBPI Merger Inc. (Califano, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
1 1 18 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Mon 04/01 9:00 AM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by EBPI Merger Inc. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/30/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 07/30/2024. (Califano, Thomas)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 04/01 9:02 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11)([LINK 24-80041 11] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A31284576, amount $1738.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1