Tara Osborn v. JAB Management Services, Inc.
Original Case: 1:22-cv-01049
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01573 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 3:20 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
JAB MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., doing business as Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
TARA OSBORN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/13/2024 3:17 AM CDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 04/24/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/20/2024 for Tara Osborn. [1] [7375350] 24-1573 (ER) [Entered: 04/10/2024 01:36 PM] | |
Att: 1 30 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court |