Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-31641

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 3:24-ap-03022
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC
Represented By
Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC
contact info
Defendant
James Goodman
Represented By
James Goodman
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott M. Seidel, Trustee
Represented By
Conor White
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
court Hearing not held Fri 04/04 9:55 AM
TDC NOT held on 4/1/2025. Related [+] (TO BE RESET TO A DATE AFTER MAY 2025) (Jeng, Hawaii)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-03022 Complaint by Scott M. Seidel against Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC, James Goodman. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Cover Sheet). Nature(s) of suit: 13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer). 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel
Sunday, March 30, 2025
32 32 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sun 03/30 11:21 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Stipulation and agreed order abating pre-trial deadlines (RE: related document(s)29 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel). Entered on 3/28/2025 (Blanco, J.)
Friday, March 28, 2025
31 31 4 pgs order Order (generic) Fri 03/28 2:30 PM
Stipulation and agreed order abating pre-trial deadlines Related [+]. Entered on 3/28/2025 (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 29 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel
Thursday, March 27, 2025
30 30 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 03/27 11:24 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge Jane J Boyle no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 3/12/2025) This matter is TRANSFERRED to the docket of District Judge Karen G. Scholer. All future pleadings in this case shall be filed under Civil Action No. 3:24-cv-3071-S. (RE: related document(s)14 Motion for withdrawal of reference filed by Defendant James Goodman, Defendant Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC). Entered on 3/25/2025 (Blanco, J.)
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
29 29 3 pgs misc Stipulation Tue 03/25 3:56 PM
Stipulation by Scott M. Seidel and Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC and James Goodman. filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel Related [+]. (White, Conor)
Related: [-] 10 Order on motion to amend scheduling order
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
28 28 order Withdrawal of reference Tue 03/25 10:13 AM
DISTRICT COURT ORDER: Case 3:24-cv-03071-S - The Court hereby ACCEPTS the bankruptcy court's R&R (Doc. 2 -1). Thus, the Court GRANTS the motion to withdraw the reference (Doc. 1 -1) and WITHDRAWS the reference to the bankruptcy court for the purpose of trial. In accordance with the R&R, the Court REFERS all pretrial matters in this adversary proceeding to the bankruptcy court for resolution, including ruling on dispositive motions. The bankruptcy court shall certify to this Court when this case is ready for trial. Finally, the Court ORDERS the parties to notify this Court if at any time they settle this matter before the bankruptcy court's certification. Related [+] Entered on 3/25/2025. (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] #14
27 27 1 pgs order Order (generic) Tue 03/25 10:04 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge Jane J Boyle no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 3/12/2025) This matter is TRANSFERRED to the docket of District Judge Karen G. Scholer. All future pleadings in this case shall be filed under Civil Action No. 3:24-cv-3071-S. Related [+]. Entered on 3/25/2025 (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for withdrawal of reference filed by Defendant James Goodman, Defendant Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
26 26 court Notice of transmission of motion to withdraw reference Wed 02/19 5:39 PM
DISTRICT COURT Notice of transmission of report and recommendation in re: motion to withdraw reference re: Civil Case # 3:24-cv-03071-B Related [+] (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 24 Report and recommendation to the U.S. District Court by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. (RE: related document(s)14 Motion for withdrawal of reference filed by Defendant James Goodman, Defendant Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC). Entered on 2/12/2025 (Blanco, J.)
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
24 24 10 pgs court Report and recommendation Wed 02/12 1:28 PM
Report and recommendation to the U.S. District Court by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. Related [+]. Entered on 2/12/2025 (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for withdrawal of reference filed by Defendant James Goodman, Defendant Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
23 23 court Hearing held Mon 01/27 3:22 PM
Hearing held on 1/22/2025. Related [+] (Counsel appeared for the Chapter 7 Trustee (S.Seidel) and Defendants Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC and James Goodman. Status conference held and concluded. Court to issue report and recommendation to the District Court on withdrawal of the reference.) (Jeng, Hawaii)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for withdrawal of reference. Fee amount $199, filed by Defendants Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC, James Goodman (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Monday, December 09, 2024
22 22 14 pgs court Notice of transmission of motion to withdraw reference Mon 12/09 3:03 PM
DISTRICT COURT'S Notice of transmission of motion to withdraw reference re: Civil Case # filed by Defendants Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC, James Goodman) (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of hearing Thu 12/05 9:30 AM
Notice of hearing /Status Conference (Hybrid) filed by Defendants Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC, James Goodman Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 1/22/2025 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for withdrawal of reference filed by Defendant James Goodman, Defendant Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
18 18 order Consolidate Wed 11/27 1:47 PM
Order granting in part, denying in part motion to consolidate on with member case 3:2024-ap-3022-mvl ORDERED that Adversary Proceeding Numbers 23-03072 and 23-03090 (the Consolidated Proceedings) are hereby consolidated for pre-trial purposes onl Related [+] Entered on 11/27/2024. (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, November 25, 2024
17 17 court Hearing held Tue 11/26 5:05 PM
Hearing held on 11/25/2024. Related [+] (Hearing Held: Counsel appeared for the Chapter 7 Trustee (S. Seidel), 18920 NW 11th, LLC, S. Zakharyayev, E. Pinkhasova, Alliance Texas Holdings, LLC, J.Auerbach, N. Auerbach, Auerbach Childrens Dynasty Trust u/a/d October 9, 2012, Auerbach Family Dynasty Trust u/a/d October 9, 2012, Auerbach Partners, L.P., Hudson Clean Energy Enterprises, LLC, James E. Goodman, People NQ Inc., JJC & People LLC, GDMN Family Investments 2, LLC, Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC, Symbiont Ventures, LLC , Goodman Investment Holdings and J. Frinzi. Motion GRANTED IN PART as set forth on the record. 23-3072 and 23-3090 are hereby consolidated for purposes of pre-trial matters and discovery. Remainder of relief requested in motion DENIED.) (Harden, D.)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to consolidate lead case 23-03072 with member case(s) 23-03090 24-03022 24-03054 procedurally for pretrial matters filed by Defendants Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC, James Goodman (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Defendant James Goodman, Defendant Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC
Friday, November 22, 2024
16 16 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Fri 11/22 3:17 PM
Witness and Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel Related [+]. (White, Conor)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to consolidate lead case 23-03072 with member case(s) 23-03090 24-03022 24-03054 procedurally for pretrial matters
Att: 1 31 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 27 pgs Exhibit B
Att: 3 10 pgs Exhibit C
Att: 4 13 pgs Exhibit D
Att: 5 4 pgs Exhibit E
Att: 6 4 pgs Exhibit F
Att: 7 3 pgs Exhibit G
15 15 court Clerk's correspondence Fri 11/22 12:31 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting a status conference hearing from attorney for defendant. Related [+] Responses due by 11/26/2024. (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for withdrawal of reference. filed by Defendants Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC, James Goodman (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
crditcrd none Fri 11/22 8:58 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for withdrawal of reference([LINK 24-03022 mvl] ) [motion,mwdref] ( 199.00). Receipt number A31997931, amount $ 199.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#14
Thursday, November 21, 2024
14 14 motion Withdrawal of reference Thu 11/21 5:52 PM
Motion for withdrawal of reference. Fee amount $199, filed by Defendants Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC, James Goodman (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 07, 2024
13 13 14 pgs answer Objection Thu 11/07 12:29 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel. (White, Conor)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to consolidate lead case 23-03072 with member case(s) 23-03090 24-03022 24-03054 procedurally for pretrial matters filed by Defendant James Goodman, Defendant Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of hearing Wed 10/09 10:57 AM
Notice of hearing (Hybrid) filed by Defendants Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC, James Goodman Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 11/25/2024 at 09:30 AM Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm for11 , (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to consolidate filed by Defendant James Goodman, Defendant Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC
Thursday, October 03, 2024
11 11 motion Consolidate Thu 10/03 5:50 PM
Motion to consolidate lead case 23-03072 with member case(s) 23-03090 24-03022 24-03054 procedurally for pretrial matters filed by Defendants Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC, James Goodman (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
10 10 order Amend scheduling order Wed 09/18 3:31 PM
Agreed Order granting motion to amend scheduling order Related [+] Trial Docket Call date set for 4/1/2025 at 01:15 PM Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. Entered on 9/18/2024. (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
9 9 motion Amend scheduling order Wed 09/11 2:48 PM
Agreed Motion to amend scheduling order. Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel (King, Jacob)
Related: [-] 3 Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding
Att: 1 3 pgs Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Tue 09/10 12:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Anna Kochut MacFarlane filed by Defendants Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC, James Goodman. (MacFarlane, Anna)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
7 7 9 pgs answer Answer to complaint Fri 05/31 6:35 PM
Answer to complaint filed by Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC, James Goodman. (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 05/02 11:48 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Scott M. Seidel filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel. (Seidel, Scott)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 21, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons service executed Sun 04/21 2:47 PM
Summons service executed on James Goodman 4/15/2024 (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit
4 4 cmp Summons service executed Sun 04/21 2:46 PM
Summons service executed on Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC 4/15/2024 (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit
Monday, April 15, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Mon 04/15 11:40 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 10/1/2024 at 01:15 PM Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. Entered on 4/15/2024 (Harden, D.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel
2 2 2 pgs court Summons issued Mon 04/15 11:38 AM
Summons issued on Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC Answer Due 5/15/2024; James Goodman Answer Due 5/15/2024 (Harden, D.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/12 3:11 PM
Adversary case 24-03022 Complaint by Scott M. Seidel against Genesis Networks Global Services, LLC, James Goodman. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 13 Related [+]. 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (White, Conor)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet