In Re: Baby Food Products Liability Litigation
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Scott Corley |
Case #: | 3:24-md-03101 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
86 | 86
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/30 6:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Price Davis for Defendants Beech-Nut Nutrition Company and Walmart Inc. (Davis, Ethan) |
|
85 | 85
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/30 8:47 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19368155.) filed by K. M..(Luhana, Roopal) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
84 | 84
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/30 8:00 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 82 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Diane Watkins. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
83 | 83
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/30 7:33 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19367903.) filed by T.F..(Watkins, Diane) Modified on 4/30/2024 (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
82 | 82
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/30 7:30 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19367899.) filed by H.N., a minor, by and through his mother and Next Friend, Geraldine Nji.(Watkins, Diane) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
81 | 81
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 9:32 PM
Letter from Pedram Esfandiary Re: Plaintiffs Steering Committee Application . (Esfandiary, Pedram) |
|
80 | 80
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 9:20 PM
Letter from R. Brent Wisner Re: Plaintiffs' Leadership Application . (Wisner, Robert) |
|
79 | 79
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 9:11 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to James Murphy. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
78 | 78
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 9:06 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 68 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas Askeroth. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
77 | 77
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 9:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Monique Amanda Alarcon on behalf of Plaintiffs A.A., and M.A., minors represented by their Guardian ad Litem Vanity Vale-Ayala; Plaintiffs L.C.N., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Sabra N. Coulter;L.D.C., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Madiera A. Stribling; N.N.M., a Minor, andB.D.M. a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Sterlin Martin; C.E.C., a Minor, by and throughGuardian ad Litem Karen D. Velez; A.S.H., a Minor, and N.G.H., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem, Miranda N. Hernandez; P.G., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Chelsea Petersen; Z.D.D., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Chelsie R. Davis; A.L.R.H., a Minor, by andthrough Guardian ad Litem Sarah E. Harlow; B.K.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Tina Long; R.D.I., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Casandra M. Isza; B.D., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Laura Gellinger; L.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Crystal G. Lyles; R.S.B., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Ieisha Banks; B.M.C., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Astacia B. Croom; R.M., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Puja Mavani; M.M, a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem April Mallory; and Plaintiffs C.L., a Minor, and H.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem ChristinaButcher; K.E., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Kristin Echols; C.R., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Erika Reynolds; A.K., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Lindsey Keesling; B.L.J., a Minor, and J.R.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Nilmarly Lopez; and A.N.R., by and through Guardian ad litem Holly Norton (Alarcon, Monique) |
|
76 | 76
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 8:50 PM
Letter from Alexandra Walsh Regarding Plaintiffs' Leadership Application . (Walsh, Alexandra) |
|
75 | 75
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 5:51 PM
Letter from Tiffany R. Ellis re Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Application . (Ellis, Tiffany) |
|
74 | 74
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 5:05 PM
Letter from Tracy L. Turner regarding Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Application . (Turner, Tracy) |
|
73 | 73
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 4:37 PM
Letter from Steven J. Brady . (Brady, Steven) |
|
72 | 72
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 4:37 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19367033.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/29/2024 filed by VZ. (Murphy, James) |
|
71 | 71
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/29 4:22 PM
NOTICE by VZ re62 Letter Supplement to Aimee H. Wagstaff's Plaintiffs' Leadership Application (Wagstaff, Aimee) |
|
70 | 70
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 4:13 PM
Letter from Joseph O. Masterman Re: Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Application . (Masterman, Joseph) |
|
69 | 69
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 3:30 PM
Letter from Emily A. DeVuono Regarding Application for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee . (DeVuono, Emily) |
|
68 | 68
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 3:17 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19366291.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/29/2024 filed by VZ. (Askeroth, Thomas) |
|
67 | 67
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 3:06 PM
Letter from Diane K. Watkins Regarding Plaintiff Steering Committee .(Watkins, Diane) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Resume, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Leadership Support List | ||
66 | 66
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emily A. DeVuono (DeVuono, Emily) |
|
65 | 65
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 2:53 PM
Letter from Madeleine B. Clavier Re: Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Application . (Clavier, Madeleine) |
|
64 | 64
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 2:51 PM
Letter from William Smith Regarding Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Application . (Smith, William) |
|
63 | 63
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 2:38 PM
Letter from Mark A. DiCello Re: Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Application . (DiCello, Mark) |
|
62 | 62
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 2:27 PM
Letter from Aimee H. Wagstaff Re: Plaintiffs' Leadership Application . (Wagstaff, Aimee) |
|
61 | 61
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 2:17 PM
Letter from Mary C. Raybon Re: Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Application . (Raybon, Mary) |
|
60 | 60
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 2:03 PM
Letter from William T. Sykes Re: Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Application . (Sykes, William) |
|
59 | 59
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 1:34 PM
Letter from Anthony Russo Regarding Plaintiff Steering Committee Position . (Russo, Anthony) |
|
58 | 58
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 1:03 PM
Letter from Laura Stemkowski regarding Plaintiff Steering Committee position . (Stemkowski, Laura) |
|
57 | 57
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Kessler Stemkowski (Stemkowski, Laura) |
|
56 | 56
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mayra A. Maturana on behalf of Plaintiffs A.A., and M.A., minors represented by their Guardian ad Litem Vanity Vale-Ayala; Plaintiffs L.C.N., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Sabra N. Coulter; L.D.C., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Madiera A. Stribling; N.N.M., a Minor, and B.D.M. a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Sterlin Martin; C.E.C., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Karen D. Velez; A.S.H., a Minor, and N.G.H., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem, Miranda N. Hernandez; P.G., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Chelsea Petersen; Z.D.D., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Chelsie R. Davis; A.L.R.H., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Sarah E. Harlow; B.K.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Tina Long; R.D.I., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Casandra M. Isza; B.D., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Laura Gellinger; L.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Crystal G. Lyles; R.S.B., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Ieisha Banks; B.M.C., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Astacia B. Croom; R.M., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Puja Mavani; M.M., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem April Mallory; and Plaintiffs C.L., a Minor, and H.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Christina Butcher; K.E., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Kristin Echols; C.R., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Erika Reynolds; A.K., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Lindsey Keesling; B.L.J., a Minor, and J.R.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Nilmarly Lopez; and A.N.R., by and through Guardian ad litem Holly Norton (Maturana, Mayra) |
|
55 | 55
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 12:09 PM
Letter from Timothy Jackson Re: Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Application . (Jackson, Timothy) |
|
54 | 54
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 11:19 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Emily DeVuono. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
53 | 53
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 11:18 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mark Abramowitz. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
52 | 52
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 11:17 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mark DiCello. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
51 | 51
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 11:17 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Donald Graham. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
50 | 50
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 11:16 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to William Sykes. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
49 | 49
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 11:15 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Laura Stemkowski. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
48 | 48
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 11:14 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Tracy Turner. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
47 | 47
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 11:13 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Madeleine Clavier. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
46 | 46
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 11:12 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Davis Cooper. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
45 | 45
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 11:11 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Diandra Debrosse Zimmermann. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
44 | 44
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 11:10 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph Masterman. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
43 | 43
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 10:31 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19363956.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/29/2024 filed by C.L..(DeVuono, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
42 | 42
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 9:55 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19363718.) filed by B.B..(Abramowitz, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
41 | 41
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 9:34 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19363588.) filed by B.B..(DiCello, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
40 | 40
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 9:21 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19363404.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/29/2024 filed by VZ. (Graham, Donald) |
|
Sunday, April 28, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Sun 04/28 4:21 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19362647.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/28/2024 filed by VZ. (Sykes, William) |
|
Saturday, April 27, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sat 04/27 6:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Sherman on behalf of Plaintiffs A.A., and M.A., minors represented by their Guardian ad Litem Vanity Vale-Ayala; Plaintiffs L.C.N., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Sabra N. Coulter; L.D.C., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Madiera A. Stribling; N.N.M., a Minor, and B.D.M. a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Sterlin Martin; C.E.C., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Karen D. Velez; A.S.H., a Minor, and N.G.H., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem, Miranda N. Hernandez; P.G., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Chelsea Petersen; Z.D.D., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Chelsie R. Davis; A.L.R.H., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Sarah E. Harlow; B.K.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Tina Long; R.D.I., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Casandra M. Isza; B.D., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Laura Gellinger; L.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Crystal G. Lyles; R.S.B., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Ieisha Banks; B.M.C., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Astacia B. Croom; R.M., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Puja Mavani; M.M., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem April Mallory; Plaintiffs C.L., a Minor, and H.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Christina Butcher; K.E., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Kristin Echols; C.R., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Erika Reynolds; A.K., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Lindsey Keesling; B.L.J., a Minor, and J.R.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Nilmarly Lopez; and A.N.R., by and through Guardian ad litem Holly Norton (Sherman, Stephanie) |
|
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sat 04/27 5:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Pedram Esfandiary on behalf of Plaintiffs A.A., and M.A., minors represented by their Guardian ad Litem Vanity Vale-Ayala; Plaintiffs L.C.N., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Sabra N. Coulter; L.D.C., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Madiera A. Stribling; N.N.M., a Minor, and B.D.M. a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Sterlin Martin; C.E.C., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Karen D. Velez; A.S.H., a Minor, and N.G.H., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem, Miranda N. Hernandez; P.G., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Chelsea Petersen; Z.D.D., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Chelsie R. Davis; A.L.R.H., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Sarah E. Harlow; B.K.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Tina Long; R.D.I., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Casandra M. Isza; B.D., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Laura Gellinger; L.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Crystal G. Lyles; R.S.B., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Ieisha Banks; B.M.C., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Astacia B. Croom; R.M., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Puja Mavani; M.M., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem April Mallory; Plaintiffs C.L., a Minor, and H.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Christina Butcher; K.E., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Kristin Echols; C.R., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Erika Reynolds; A.K., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Lindsey Keesling; B.L.J., a Minor, and J.R.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Nilmarly Lopez; and A.N.R., by and through Guardian ad litem Holly Norton (Esfandiary, Pedram) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 10:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Brent Wisner Plaintiffs A.A., and M.A., minors represented by their Guardian ad Litem Vanity Vale-Ayala; Plaintiffs L.C.N., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Sabra N. Coulter;L.D.C., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Madiera A. Stribling; N.N.M., a Minor, andB.D.M. a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Sterlin Martin; C.E.C., a Minor, by and throughGuardian ad Litem Karen D. Velez; A.S.H., a Minor, and N.G.H., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem, Miranda N. Hernandez; P.G., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Chelsea Petersen; Z.D.D., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Chelsie R. Davis; A.L.R.H., a Minor, by andthrough Guardian ad Litem Sarah E. Harlow; B.K.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Tina Long; R.D.I., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Casandra M. Isza; B.D., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Laura Gellinger; L.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Crystal G. Lyles; R.S.B., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Ieisha Banks; B.M.C., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Astacia B. Croom; R.M., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem Puja Mavani; M.M, a Minor, by and through Guardian ad Litem April Mallory; Plaintiffs C.L., a Minor, and H.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Christina Butcher; K.E., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Kristin Echols; C.R., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Erika Reynolds; A.K., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Lindsey Keesling; B.L.J., a Minor, and J.R.L., a Minor, by and through Guardian ad litem Nilmarly Lopez; and A.N.R., by and through Guardian ad litem Holly Norton (Wisner, Robert) |
|
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 7:17 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Tiffany Ellis. (ahm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
34 | 34
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 7:16 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gary Anderson. (ahm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 7:14 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Anthony J. Russo Jr.. (ahm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
32 | 32
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 7:12 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin McKie. (ahm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 7:09 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jessica A. Reynolds. (ahm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 7:07 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy E. Jackson. (ahm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
29 | 29
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 7:04 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mary C. Raybon. (ahm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 6:57 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory Cade. (ahm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 6:42 PM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David N. Sneed. (ahm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 3:35 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19361533.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/26/2024 filed by L.C.N..(Stemkowski, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
25 | 25
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 3:00 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19361213.) filed by Ashely Garcia, N.C..(Turner, Tracy) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
24 | 24
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 2:20 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19360836.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/26/2024 filed by B.B..(Clavier, Madeleine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
23 | 23
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 2:07 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19360607.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/26/2024 filed by VZ.(Cooper, Davis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing | ||
22 | 22
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 2:03 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19360688.) filed by B.B..(Debrosse Zimmermann, Diandra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
21 | 21
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 2:03 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19360421.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/26/2024 filed by VZ.(Masterman, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing | ||
20 | 20
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 1:13 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19360279.) filed by D.J..(Ellis, Tiffany) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
19 | 19
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 12:26 PM
First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number 6634431.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/26/2024 filed by P.A..(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing | ||
18 | 18
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 12:17 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19359730.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/26/2024 filed by A.T..(Russo, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
17 | 17
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 12:14 PM
First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number 5432062.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/26/2024 filed by P.A..(Cade, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing | ||
16 | 16
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 12:04 PM
First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number 5430944.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/26/2024 filed by P.A..(Mckie, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 7:30 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19358122.) filed by N.C., Garcia. |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
14 | 14
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 4:05 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19357518.) filed by Z.W.. (Jackson, Timothy) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 3:25 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19354263.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/25/2024 filed by Shawntilea Clark.(Raybon, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
12 | 12
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 11:14 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David N. Sneed ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19355231.) filed by Hain Celestial Group, Inc..(Sneed, David) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 7:52 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Phyllis A. Jones. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/23 1:58 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) MDL Panel on 4/23/24. (as, COURT STAFF) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 12:34 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Phyllis A. Jones ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19346953.) filed by Hain Celestial Group, Inc..(Jones, Phyllis) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing |