P.A. v. Hain Celestial Group, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:24-md-03101
Lead case: 3:24-md-03101
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Scott Corley |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02484 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Hawaii, 1:24-cv-00008 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 25, 2024 5:06 PM PDT |
Defendant
Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES 1 through 100
|
|
Defendant
Hain Celestial Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nurture, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Plum, PBC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sprout Foods Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
P.A., a minor represented by mother and Next Friend Brandi-Lynn Hyden
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Healthy's, Inc.
Terminated: 12/28/2023
|
|
Plaintiff
Zurishaddai Aki
Terminated: 04/13/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandi-Lynn Hyden
Terminated: 04/13/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
70 | 70
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 12:24 PM
First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19359960.) filed by P. A..(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing | ||
69 | 69
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 12:11 PM
First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19359901.) filed by P. A..(Cade, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing | ||
68 | 68
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 11:58 AM
First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19359809.) filed by P. A..(Mckie, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
67 | 67
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 04/25 4:08 PM
Case transferred in from District of Hawaii; Case Number 1:24-cv-00008. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Thu 04/25 4:15 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED:, Hawaii, 1:24-cv-00008, P.A. v. Hain Celestial Group, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-02484-JSC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: JPMDL (far, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
66 | 66 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re: (CERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1), MDL No. 3101, Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete, Clerk of the Panel, received from the Northern District of California. (jni) | |
65 | 65 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re: TEXT ENTRY ORDER, (UNCERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1), MDL No. 3101, Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete, Clerk of the Panel. As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. (jni) | |
64 | 64 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re: (UNCERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1), MDL No. 3101, Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete, Clerk of the Panel. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation , the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of April 11, 2024, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Jacqueline Scott Corley. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (jni) |