Maryland District Court
Judge:Richard D Bennett
Case #: 1:24-cv-01047
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Terminated:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2024 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant
T-Mobile USA, Inc.
3650 131 Street, SE
Bellevue, WA 98006
Represented By
R. Kennon Poteat, III
Williams & Connolly
contact info
Jessica Bodger Rydstrom
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Teresa M. Wogoman
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
William I. Stewart
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Kenneth Jerome Brown
Williams & Connolly
contact info
Defendant
TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC
Represented By
R. Kennon Poteat, III
Williams & Connolly
contact info
Jessica Bodger Rydstrom
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Teresa M. Wogoman
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
William I. Stewart
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Kenneth Jerome Brown
Williams & Connolly
contact info
Plaintiff
Bloosurf, LLC
1222 Old Ocean City Rd
Salisbury, MD 21804
Represented By
Patrick Robert Corish
Chap Petersen & Associates
contact info
John Chapman Petersen
Chap Petersen & Associates, PLC
contact info
Federico Jose Zablah-Siman
Chap Petersen And Associates, PLC
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/28/2025. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
41 41 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 04/22 3:51 PM
USCA Case Number 25-1412 for39 Notice of Appeal filed by Bloosurf, LLC. Case Manager - Cyndi Halupa (kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
40 40 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Wed 04/16 4:24 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re39 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
39 39 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 04/15 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Bloosurf, LLC. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AMDDC-11909332.(Corish, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/15 8:13 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice; the Clerk of Court will close this case. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/14/2025. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
37 37 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 03/28 3:32 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting23 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/28/2025. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
36 36 32 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Fri 03/28 3:23 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/28/2025. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
35 35 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/25 1:18 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re29 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Bloosurf, LLC.(Petersen, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A.,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. C.,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh. D,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 10/22 11:40 AM
MARGINAL ORDER approving33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William I. Stewart terminated. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/22/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 10/22 11:00 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney William I. Stewart (pro hac vice) by T-Mobile USA, Inc., TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC(Rydstrom, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
32 32 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/18 1:52 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re29 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc., TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC.(Wogoman, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 17, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/17 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dana B. Kinel on behalf of All Defendants (Kinel, Dana)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/07 10:57 AM
NOTICE by Bloosurf, LLC re29 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint of Correction to Memorandum in Support(Petersen, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A. - Corrected Memorandum In Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. B - Redline of Memorandum
Friday, October 04, 2024
29 29 motion Amend/Correct Fri 10/04 3:43 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Bloosurf, LLC(Petersen, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. A to memo in support (Proposed Amended Complaint),
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. A to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh B to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh C to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh D to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exh E to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exh F to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exh G to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exh H to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exh I to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exh J to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exh K to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exh L to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exh M to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exh N to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exh O to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exh P to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 19 Exhibit Exh Q to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 20 Exhibit Exh R to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 21 Exhibit Exh S to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 22 Exhibit Exh T to proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 23 Exhibit Exh. B to memo in support (redlined amended complaint)
Friday, August 02, 2024
28 28 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 08/02 2:45 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc., TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC.(Wogoman, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
27 27 misc Request for Hearing Fri 07/12 3:41 PM
Request for Hearing re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (Petersen, John)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 07/12 3:38 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Bloosurf, LLC.(Petersen, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 06/25 5:04 PM
ORDER granting24 Joint Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Briefing on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/25/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 06/25 3:19 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by T-Mobile USA, Inc., TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC(Rydstrom, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
23 23 motion Dismiss Wed 06/05 2:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by T-Mobile USA, Inc., TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC(Wogoman, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Declaration of William I. Stewart in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10,
Att: 13 Exhibit 11,
Att: 14 Exhibit 12,
Att: 15 Exhibit 13,
Att: 16 Exhibit 14,
Att: 17 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/01 10:09 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of William I. Stewart. Directing attorney William I. Stewart to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/01 10:11 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Teresa M. Wogoman. Directing attorney Teresa M. Wogoman to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/30 3:15 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kenneth Jerome Brown. Directing attorney Kenneth Jerome Brown to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/30 3:38 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of R. Kennon Poteat, III. Directing attorney R. Kennon Poteat, III to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
18 18 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/29 10:53 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Teresa M. Wogoman (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11230864.) by T-Mobile USA, Inc., TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC(Rydstrom, Jessica)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/29 10:50 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William I. Stewart (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11230836.) by T-Mobile USA, Inc., TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC(Rydstrom, Jessica)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/29 11:45 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Judge George Levi Russell, III no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/26 3:02 PM
ORDER granting11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/26/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/26 11:51 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for R. Kennon Poteat III (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11228510.) by T-Mobile USA, Inc., TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC(Rydstrom, Jessica)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/26 11:48 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth J. Brown (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11228472.) by T-Mobile USA, Inc., TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC(Rydstrom, Jessica)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/26 11:29 AM
NOTICE by T-Mobile USA, Inc., TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC of Related Case, No. 1:22-cv-3254- RDB (D. Md.) (Rydstrom, Jessica)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 04/26 11:22 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by T-Mobile USA, Inc., TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc., Other Affiliate T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V., Other Affiliate T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH for T-Mobile USA, Inc., TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC.(Rydstrom, Jessica)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/26 10:49 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by T-Mobile USA, Inc., TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC(Rydstrom, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/26 10:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Bodger Rydstrom on behalf of All Defendants (Rydstrom, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
9 9 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 04/16 4:54 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bloosurf, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pocomoke Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Groupe Alsatis, Other Affiliate Paul Carliner Irrevocable Trust, Party with Financial Interest Vincent Sabathier, Party with Financial Interest Naimat Mughal, Party with Financial Interest Neil B. Stegman DC revocable Trust for Bloosurf, LLC.(Petersen, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 QC NOTICE:5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Bloosurf, LLC was filed incorrectly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. >**When docketing the Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement the Corporate Parents, Affiliates and parties with a financial interest MUST be entered when prompted by CM/ECF to do so. Please re-file the document correctly. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Federico Jose Zablah-Siman. Directing attorney Federico Jose Zablah-Siman to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Patrick Robert Corish. Directing attorney Patrick Robert Corish to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/16 11:35 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Patrick Robert Corish. Directing attorney Patrick Robert Corish to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/16 2:16 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Federico Jose Zablah-Siman. Directing attorney Federico Jose Zablah-Siman to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 04/16 4:34 PM
QC NOTICE:5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Bloosurf, LLC was filed incorrectly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. >**When docketing the Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement the Corporate Parents, Affiliates and parties with a financial interest MUST be entered when prompted by CM/ECF to do so. Please re-file the document correctly. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
5 5 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Mon 04/15 10:07 AM
(FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bloosurf, LLC (Petersen, John) Modified on 4/16/2024 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/15 1:53 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
4 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to T-Mobile USA, Inc., TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC.(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 4/19/2024 (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
3 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Federico Jose Zablah-Siman (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11197487.) by Bloosurf, LLC(Petersen, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick R. Corish (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11197482.) by Bloosurf, LLC(Petersen, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11195317.), filed by Bloosurf, LLC.(Petersen, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh.B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. C.,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh. D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh.F,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh.G,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exh.H,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exh.I,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exh. J,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exh. K,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exh. L,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exh. M,
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 14 Summons Summons for TDI Acquisition Sub, LLC,
Att: 15 Summons Summons for T-Mobile USA, Inc.,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exh. E