Original Case: 1:24-cv-01047

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv.pr-01412
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 6:05 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
T-MOBILE USA, INCORPORATED
Represented By
Raymond Kennon Poteat III
WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP
contact info
Dana B. Kinel
WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP
contact info
Teresa M. Wogoman
WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP
contact info
Jessica Bodger Rydstrom
WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP
contact info
Kenneth Jerome Brown
WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TDI ACQUISITION SUB, LLC
Represented By
Raymond Kennon Poteat III
WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP
contact info
Dana B. Kinel
WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP
contact info
Teresa M. Wogoman
WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP
contact info
Jessica Bodger Rydstrom
WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP
contact info
Kenneth Jerome Brown
WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BLOOSURF, LLC
Represented By
John Chapman Petersen
CHAP PETERSEN & ASSOCIATES, PLC
contact info
Federico Jose Zablah-Siman
CHAP PETERSEN & ASSOCIATES, PLC
contact info
Patrick Robert Corish
CHAP PETERSEN & ASSOCIATES, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/21/2025 6:04 AM EDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:24-cv-01047-RDB. Case manager: CHalupa. [1001755974] 25-1412 CH [Entered: 04/18/2025 12:57 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:24-cv-01047-RDB. Mailed to: Dana Kinel, Jessica Rydstrom, Teresa Wogoman. [1001756166] 25-1412 CH [Entered: 04/18/2025 04:28 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Dana Kinel, Jessica Rydstrom, Teresa Wogoman. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. All filings must comply with Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide. [1001756169] Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/28/2025. Response Brief due 06/27/2025. 25-1412 CH [Entered: 04/18/2025 04:31 PM]
Related: [-]