California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:J Barrett Marum
Case #: 3:24-bk-01357
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $50,001 to $100,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Histogen Inc.
231 Market Pl PMB 373
San Ramon, CA 94583-4743
Represented By
Eric D. Goldberg
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 46 seconds ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
282 282 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Wed 04/16 9:09 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 04/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 281 Generic Order re: Application
281 281 order ~Generic~ Order re: Application Mon 04/14 11:53 AM
Order Regarding Final Application of Frankie E. Noble For Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses As Special Litigation Counsel with BNC Service Related [+] signed on 4/14/2025. (Crosby, A)
Related: [-] 235
Friday, April 11, 2025
280 280 vCal Virtual Minute Entry - CHAP Fri 04/11 9:12 AM
Virtual Minute. Hearing Date: 04/24/2025, MATTER: STATUS RE: 1) STATUS RE: MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY RS # RPG-1 FILED ON BEHALF OF CONNIE HARRELL (fr 3/6/25) 2) STATUS RE: DEBTOR'S OBJECTION TO CLAIM NO. 4 OF CONNIE HARRELL (fr 3/6/25) 3) MOTION FOR ALLOWANCE AND PAYMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE EXPENSE FILED BY: GOE FORSYTHE & HODGES LLP (fr 3/6/25), DISPOSITION: Off calendar; Settlement Order resolving all issues entered 4/2/25 via docket #276. Related [+] (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] 150 Motion for Relief from Stay,236 Motion to Allow or Amend Claims,91 Objection to Claim and Notice Thereof
279 279 vCal Tentative Ruling - CHAP Fri 04/11 8:43 AM
Amended Tentative Ruling. Department 2: Hearing Date and Time: 04/24/2025 @ 2:00 PM Related [+] (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] 150 Motion for Relief from Stay,91 Objection to Claim and Notice Thereof,236 Motion to Allow or Amend Claims
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
278 278 vCal Tentative Ruling - CHAP Wed 04/09 11:54 AM
Tentative Ruling. Department 2: Hearing Date and Time: 04/24/2025 @ 2:00 PM Related [+] (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] 150 Motion for Relief from Stay,236 Motion to Allow or Amend Claims,91 Objection to Claim and Notice Thereof