Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-01357

California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher B Latham
Case #: 3:24-ap-90057
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Histogen Inc.
231 Market Place, Suite 373
San Ramon, CA 94583
Represented By
Histogen Inc.
contact info
Plaintiffs
Connie Harrell
17701 Cowan, Suite 210 Bldg. D
Irvine, CA 92614
Represented By
Robert P. Goe
Goe Forsythe & Hodges LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Thursday, October 31, 2024
29 29 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Sat 11/02 9:09 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 11/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Stipulated Order
28 28 vCal Court Minutes - CHAP Fri 11/01 8:36 AM
Court Minutes. Hearing Date 10/31/2024, MATTER: MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF HARRELL'S CLAIM FILED BY DEFENDANT Related [+] DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] storing matter from 9/17/24 hearing12 Opposition
27 27 order Stipulated Order Thu 10/31 12:16 PM
Order Regarding Stipulated That Any Allowed Claim of Connie Harrell is Non-Dischargeable ; with BNC Service Related [+] signed on 10/31/2024. (Crosby, A)
Related: [-] 20 Notice of Lodgment of Order
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
26 26 notice Miscellaneous (Document/Notice) Wed 10/30 3:15 PM
Notice of Consent to Proposed Judgment Submitted as Docket No. 20-1 with Proof of Service filed by Robert P. Goe of Goe Forsythe & Hodges LLP on behalf of Connie Harrell. (Goe, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
25 25 vCal Tentative Ruling - CHAP Mon 10/28 9:43 AM
Tentative Ruling. Department 2: Hearing Date and Time: 10/31/2024 @ 11:00 AM Related [+] (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] 12 Opposition
Friday, October 18, 2024
24 24 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Sun 10/20 9:08 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 10/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Notice of Hearing/Trial
23 23 notice Hearing/Trial (Notice) (CSD 1187 & 3024)(BNC) Fri 10/18 12:03 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] HEARING Scheduled for 10/31/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 2, Room 118, Weinberger Courthouse . (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] storing matter from 9/17/24 hearing12 Opposition
Thursday, September 19, 2024
22 22 trustee Statement Thu 09/19 9:44 AM
Statement Response Of Connie Harrell To Alternate Order Submitted By Defendant Histogen, Inc. [Docket No. 20] with proof of service filed by Robert P. Goe on behalf of Connie Harrell. Related [+] (Goe, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
21 21 notice Lodgment of Order (Notice) (CSD 1500) Thu 09/19 9:38 AM
Notice of Lodgment of Order Judgment in Favor of Connie Harrell with Service filed by Robert P. Goe of Goe Forsythe & Hodges LLP on behalf of Connie Harrell. Related [+] (Goe, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
20 20 notice Lodgment of Order (Notice) (CSD 1500) Wed 09/18 3:41 PM
Notice of Lodgment of Order with Service filed by Eric D. Goldberg of DLA Piper LLP (US) on behalf of Histogen Inc.. Related [+] (Goldberg, Eric)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
18 18 notice Lodgment of Order (Notice) (CSD 1500) Wed 09/18 11:23 AM
Notice of Lodgment of Order of Judgment in Favor of Connie Harrell with Service filed by Robert P. Goe of Goe Forsythe & Hodges LLP on behalf of Connie Harrell. Related [+] (Goe, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
19 19 vCal Court Minutes - CHAP Wed 09/18 3:11 PM
Court Minutes. Hearing Date 09/17/2024, MATTER: MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF HARRELL'S CLAIM FILED BY DEFENDANT DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. Related [+] (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss
Monday, September 16, 2024
17 17 vCal Tentative Ruling - CHAP Mon 09/16 3:58 PM
Tentative Ruling. Department 2: Hearing Date and Time: 09/17/2024 @ 1:30 PM Related [+] (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss
Friday, August 30, 2024
16 16 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Sun 09/01 9:08 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 09/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Notice of Change in Date Fixed for Trial/Hearing
15 15 notice Change in Date Fixed for Trial/Hearing (Notice) (CSD 1188 & 3025)(BNC) Fri 08/30 1:53 PM
Notice of Change in Date Fixed for Hearing HEARING Scheduled for 9/17/2024 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 2, Room 118, Weinberger Courthouse . Related [+] (Paluso, R.)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss
14 14 vCal Virtual Minute Entry - CHAP Fri 08/30 12:35 PM
Virtual Minute Entry. Termination of Hearing DATE: 09/11/2024. MATTER: MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF HARRELL'S CLAIM FILED BY DEFENDANT. DISPOSITION: Matter off calendar in Dept 1. Case has been transferred to Dept 2, which will re-calendar the hearing. Related [+] (Rodriguez-Olivas, J.)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss
13 13 notice Change in Assigned Judge and Number (Notice)(paperless entry) Fri 08/30 11:05 AM
Notice of Change in Assigned Judge and Number. Assigned to Judge J Barrett Marum. You are further notified that the case number and judges initials (JBM) MUST appear on all papers in connection with the subject case. (Emery, JC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
12 12 ans Opposition Fri 08/23 12:42 PM
Opposition Plaintiff Connie Harrells Opposition To Histogen Inc.s Motion To Dismiss, Or In The Alternative, Stay The Adversary Proceeding Pending The Resolution Of Harrells Claim with proof of service filed by Robert P. Goe of Goe Forsythe & Hodges LLP on behalf of on behalf of Connie Harrell. Related [+] (Goe, Robert)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss
Monday, August 12, 2024
11 11 notice Miscellaneous (Document/Notice) Mon 08/12 12:23 PM
Request for Courtesy Notification of Electronic Filing (NEF) filed by Brandon J. Iskander on behalf of Connie Harrell. (Iskander, Brandon)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Hearing & Motion (Notice) (CSD 1181, 1183 & 3015) [14 day opp] Mon 08/12 7:28 AM
Notice of Hearing and Motion with Certificate of Service. (Corrected file per Dkt. No. 9) filed by David Michael Riley of DLA Piper LLP (US) on behalf of Histogen Inc.. HEARING Scheduled for 9/11/2024 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 1, Room 218, Weinberger Courthouse . Notice Served On: 8/9/2024. Opposition due on 08/23/2024 unless an objector is entitled to additional time under FRBP 9006. Related [+] (Riley, David)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Hearing and Motion
Friday, August 09, 2024
9 9 court Errors/Deficiencies (BNC) Fri 08/09 4:06 PM
Notice to Filer of Errors and/or Deficiencies in Documents. Adv Proc Misc. Tickler Due Date: 8/13/2024, Related [+] (Crosby, A)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Hearing and Motion
8 8 motion Hearing & Motion (Notice) (CSD 1181, 1183 & 3015) [14 day opp] Fri 08/09 1:47 PM
Notice of Hearing and Motion with Certificate of Service. filed by David Michael Riley of DLA Piper LLP (US) on behalf of Histogen Inc.. HEARING Scheduled for 9/11/2024 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 1, Room 218, Weinberger Courthouse . Notice Served On: 8/9/2024. Opposition due on 08/23/2024 unless an objector is entitled to additional time under FRBP 9006. Related [+] (Riley, David)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss
7 7 motion Dismiss (Motion) Fri 08/09 1:44 PM
Histogen Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, Stay the Adversary Proceeding Pending the Resolution of Harrell's Claim filed by David Michael Riley on behalf of Histogen Inc.. (Riley, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
6 6 notice Appearance / Special Notice (Request) (paperless entry) Tue 07/30 10:43 AM
Notice of Appearance Histogen Inc.,, filed by David Michael Riley on behalf of Histogen Inc.. (Riley, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance / Special Notice (Request) (paperless entry) Tue 07/30 10:41 AM
Notice of Appearance Histogen Inc.,, filed by Eric D. Goldberg on behalf of Histogen Inc.. (Goldberg, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
4 4 cmp Return of Summons Served Mon 07/22 4:03 PM
Summons Served on: Histogen Inc.. Served On 07/22/2024 filed by Robert P. Goe on behalf of Connie Harrell. (Goe, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
3 3 trustee Statement Fri 07/19 4:44 PM
Statement1 Complaint filed by Robert P Goe on behalf of Connie Harrell Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet filed by Robert P. Goe on behalf of Connie Harrell. Related [+] (Goe, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 court Summons Issued (CSD 2500A) (auto) Fri 07/19 4:37 PM
Summons Issued on Histogen Inc. Answer Due 08/19/2024; with Certificate of Service. (Goe, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 07/19 4:36 PM
Adversary case 24-90057 Complaint by Connie Harrell against Histogen Inc.. Nature of Suit: 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) , Fee Amount $ 350.00 Filed by Robert P. Goe on behalf of Connie Harrell. (Goe, Robert)
Related: [-]