Aubie v. Fortra, LLC
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:24-md-03090
Lead case: 1:24-md-03090
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodolfo A Ruiz, II |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21471 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:23-cv-01155 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Fortra LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Marc Aubie
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Thu 04/18 5:53 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II on 4/18/2024. See attached document for full details. This document relates to: 1:24-md-03090-RAR, 1:24-cv-21466-RAR, 1:24-cv-21471-RAR (gp) |
|
14 | 14
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Thu 04/18 5:18 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from the District of Minnesota. Case Number 23-cv-01155-SRN-DTS with documents 1-12. Assigned FLSD Case Number 24-cv-21471-RAR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 24-md-3090-RAR. (jas) |
|
13 | 13
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 04/18 5:16 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. (jas) |
|
12 | 12
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Thu 04/18 4:58 PM
Case transferred in from Minnesota; Case Number 0:23-cv-01155. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jas) |
|
11 | 11
order
Administrative Order
Thu 04/18 11:35 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Rodolfa A. Ruiz, II.(kt) |
|
utility
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 04/18 5:55 PM
Civil Case Closed for administrative purposes only. (gp) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #3090 re:1 Complaint. (CLK) | |
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 FILED IN ERROR -- (Text-Only) ORDER granting7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey S Goldenberg for Marc Aubie. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 5/9/2023. (jam) Modified text on 5/17/2023 (SAD). | |
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR -- MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey S. Goldenberg. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10258452 filed by Marc Aubie. (Bleichner, Bryan) Modified text on 5/17/2023 (SAD). | |
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 (Text-Only) ORDER granting4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Charles E Schaffer for Marc Aubie. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/27/2023. (jam) | |
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FORE REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. This case reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz for all further proceedings. Judge Donovan W. Frank, Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 23-cv-1155 SRN/DTS . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/25/2023 and Judge Donovan W. Frank on 4/26/2023.(CLK) | |
4 | 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Charles E. Schaffer. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10230249 filed by Marc Aubie. (Bleichner, Bryan) | |
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Charles E. Schaffer, Nicholas J. Elia, Jeffrey S. Goldenberg, Todd B. Naylor as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (ABR) | |
2 | 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 23-cv-1155 (DWF/TNL). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR) | |
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Fortra, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10224756) filed by Marc Aubie. No summons requested. (Bleichner, Bryan) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |