Institutional Shareholder Services, Inc. v. SEC, et al
Original Case: 1:19-cv-03275
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cvus-05105 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 4:16 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Securities and Exchange Commission
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gary Gensler, in his official capacity as Chair of the Securities and Exchange Commission
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor for Defendant - Appellant
National Association of Manufacturers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Institutional Shareholder Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 4:16 AM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 24-5105 | ||
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2051000] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-03275-APM filed by National Association of Manufacturers. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-5105 24-5105 | ||
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2051005] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/23/2024. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/23/2024. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/23/2024. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/23/2024. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/23/2024. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/23/2024. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/23/2024. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/23/2024. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/07/2024; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/23/2024. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/23/2024. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/23/2024. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/07/2024 24-5105 |