Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-30135

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joel D Applebaum
Case #: 4:24-ap-03039
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2024
Terminated:Sep 09, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Amar Shango
3382 Creekview Drive
Davison, MI 48423
Represented By
Amar Shango
contact info
Plaintiff
Collene Corcoran, Trustee
P.O. Box 535
Oxford, MI 48371
Represented By
Samuel D. Sweet
Samuel D. Sweet, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, September 09, 2024
30 30 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Mon 09/09 11:09 AM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 9/9/2024, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Joel D. Applebaum. (KEC)
Related: [-]
29 29 court Copy of Mon 09/09 11:01 AM
Copy of: Order Approving Trustee's Third Omnibus Motion for Approval to Compromise Various Preference Claims of the Estate (Filed in Bankruptcy) (KEC)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 09/09 11:09 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:24-ap-3039 : Settled. (KEC)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 09/09 11:10 AM
Adversary Case 4:24-ap-3039 Closed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
28 28 audio . Wed 08/07 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/7/2024 11:00:11 AM ]. File Size [ 1552 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:14 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Matter Settled Wed 08/07 12:11 PM
Minute Entry. Matter Settled. Initial Scheduling Conference Held. Related [+] (KHM)
Related: [-] 19 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Thursday, August 01, 2024
27 27 misc Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference Thu 08/01 12:27 PM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcoran, Trustee. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
26 26 answer Response Thu 07/25 11:29 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcoran, Trustee (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-] 17 Affirmative Defenses
Friday, June 28, 2024
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/29 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/29 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Deficiency Notice
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/28 1:01 PM
Corrected Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Amar Shango Related [+]. (McManus, Matthew)
Related: [-] 22 Affirmative Defenses
22 22 misc Affirmative Defenses Fri 06/28 12:59 PM
Affirmative Defenses Corrected Filed by Defendant Amar Shango. (McManus, Matthew)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/28 12:58 PM
Corrected Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Amar Shango Related [+]. (McManus, Matthew)
Related: [-] 20 Answer to Complaint
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/28 12:56 PM
Corrected Answer to Complaint Filed by Amar Shango. (McManus, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
19 19 court Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference Wed 06/26 3:29 PM
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 8/7/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. --- Note: effective beginning March 16, 2020, Judge Applebaum is conducting all conferences and non- evidentiary hearings by telephone. At least five minutes before the scheduled time for such a hearing, counsel and parties should call (202) 503-1666 and use conference ID 96965490#. Counsel and parties should place their phone on mute and wait until their case is called before unmuting their phone and participating. Under no circumstance is a party or their counsel to place their phone on hold. (This procedure does not apply to Chapter 13 status conferences with the Chapter 13 Trustee. See any applicable notices by the Chapter 13 Trustee for information about status conferences.) (KHM)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Wed 06/26 9:06 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Electronic Signature Incorrect Format ECF Procedure 11 d-1, and Proof of Service Non-Compliant. Related [+] Electronic Signature Incorrect Format ECF Procedure 11 (d)(1) due on 7/3/2024. Proof of Service Due on 7/3/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-] 16 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Amar Shango,17 Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Amar Shango
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
17 17 misc Affirmative Defenses Tue 06/25 1:04 PM
Affirmative Defenses Filed by Defendant Amar Shango. (McManus, Matthew)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/25 1:03 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Amar Shango. (McManus, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
15 15 order stipulated order Thu 06/13 2:05 PM
Order Extending Answer Deadline Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcoran, Trustee
14 14 misc Stipulation Thu 06/13 1:30 PM
Stipulation By and Between Samuel D. Sweet and Matthew C. McManus Re: Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint to June 27, 2024 . Filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcoran, Trustee. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/24 10:57 AM
Corrected Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Amar Shango. (McManus, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
12 12 order Striking Document (text) Thu 05/23 11:47 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because of failure to comply with deficiency notice Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Joel D. Applebaum (JAM)
Related: [-] Certificate of Service11 Certificate of Service filed by Defendant Amar Shango
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/22 1:08 PM
THIS PLEADING HAS BEEN STRICKEN PER ORDER OF THE COURT DATED 5/23/2024. Corrected Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Amar Shango. (McManus, Matthew) Modified on 5/23/2024 (MSK)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Striking Document (text) Wed 05/22 9:36 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the Electronic signature and the adversary case number is missing Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Joel D. Applebaum (JAM)
Related: [-] Certificate of Service7 Certificate of Service filed by Defendant Amar Shango
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
9 9 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Tue 05/21 3:08 PM
Order Extending Answer Deadline to June 13, 2024 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcoran, Trustee
8 8 misc Stipulation Tue 05/21 1:08 PM
Stipulation By and Between Samuel D. Sweet and Matthew C. McManus Re: Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint to June 13, 2024 . Filed by Plaintiff Collene Corcoran, Trustee. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/21 12:58 PM
Corrected Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Amar Shango. (McManus, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 18, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/19 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Deficiency Notice (BK)
Thursday, May 16, 2024
5 5 court Deficiency Notice (BK) Thu 05/16 11:45 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Non-Compliant. Related [+] Proof of Service Due on 5/23/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Defendant Amar Shango
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/15 2:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Amar Shango. (McManus, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 04/25 1:10 PM
Summons Service Executed on Amar Shango 4/25/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 04/25 1:06 PM
Summons Issued on Amar Shango Answer Due 05/28/2024 (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/25 1:06 PM
Adversary case 24-03039 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Collene Corcoran, Trustee against Amar Shango. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Sweet, Samuel)
Related: [-]