Original Case: 3:20-cv-00141

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-05407
Typecivil / private / federal question
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2024
Terminated:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 6:36 AM CDT
Amicus Curiae
JULIE A. SU, Acting Secretary of Labor
Represented By
Anne Warren King
U.S. Department of Labor
contact info
Amicus Curiae
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By
Erin Mohan
U.S. Department of Labor
contact info
Anne Warren King
U.S. Department of Labor
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HAMILTON-RYKER IT SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By
Paul Michael Knettel
Baker & Hostetler
contact info
Defendant - Appellee Cross-Appellant
HAMILTON-RYKER IT SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By
Lauren Theresa Stuy
BakerHostetler
contact info
Ashlee Cassman Grant
Baker & Hostetler
contact info
Jennifer Rose Stanley DeVlugt
Baker & Hostetler
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
LYNWOOD PICKENS, Individually and For Others Similarly Situated
Represented By
Richard M. Schreiber
Josephson Dunlap
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant Cross-Appellee
LYNWOOD PICKENS, Individually and For Others Similarly Situated
Represented By
Richard J. Burch
Richard Burch
contact info
David Michael Mathews
Josephson Dunlap
contact info
Melody L. Fowler-Green
Yezbak Law Offices
contact info

GPO Apr 01 2025
OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : REVERSED and REMANDED. Mandate to issue. Decision for publication. Jeffrey S. Sutton, Chief Judge (AUTHORING); Raymond M. Kethledge (CONCURRING), and Eric E. Murphy (DISSENTING), Circuit Judges. [24-5407, 24-5459]

Docket last updated: 04/03/2025 6:36 AM CDT
Thursday, April 25, 2024
The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Lynwood Pickens. Transcript needed: y. (ASM)
Related: [-]