Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:J Randal Hall
Referred: Brian K Epps
Case #: 1:24-cv-00054
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2024
Terminated:Aug 20, 2024
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Terminated: 08/20/2024
Defendant
McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC
Terminated: 08/20/2024
Plaintiff
James Lamont Taylor
Terminated: 08/20/2024
3612 Mike Padgett Highway
Augusta, GA 30906

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/22 9:32 AM
ORDER denying17 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; and directing the Clerk to transmit this Order to the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by District Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/22/2025. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
18 18 appeal Appeal Transcript Request Mon 09/09 2:31 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by James Lamont Taylor. (jlh)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Mon 09/09 2:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, by James Lamont Taylor. Responses due by 9/23/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
16 16 appeal USCA Case Number Fri 08/30 11:50 AM
USCA Case Number 24-12771 A for13 Notice of Appeal filed by James Lamont Taylor. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
14 14 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 08/27 2:42 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:11 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,13 Notice of Appeal,12 Clerk's Judgment. Other Appeals: No, Judge Appealed: Judge J. Randal Hall, Fee Paid: No.(maa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet
13 13 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 08/27 2:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to11 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,12 Clerk's Judgment by James Lamont Taylor. (maa)
Related: [-]
appeal FRAP Certificate of Readiness Tue 08/27 2:44 PM
F.R.A.P. Certificate of Readiness re13 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically . (maa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
12 12 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 08/20 8:46 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 08/20/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Tue 08/20 8:42 AM
ORDER ADOPTING the8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as the Court's opinion, dismissing this case for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, and closing this civil action. Signed by District Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/20/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
10 10 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Wed 08/07 4:27 PM
OBJECTION to8 Report and Recommendations by James Lamont Taylor. (maa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Wed 07/24 4:05 PM
ORDER directing service of the8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/24/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 07/24 4:03 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this case be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and this civil action be closed. Objections to R&R due by 8/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/24/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Recusal Wed 07/24 3:59 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If in the future, however, it appears that Plaintiff's financial situation has improved, the Court may act on its own initiative to require Plaintiff to pay either the entire filing fee or an appropriately determined partial filing fee; denying6 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/24/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
utility Motions Referred Mon 07/15 2:20 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:6 MOTION for Recusal (cmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
6 6 motion Recusal Mon 07/01 9:31 AM
MOTION for Recusal by James Lamont Taylor. Responses due by 7/15/2024. (gmh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/13 2:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by James Lamont Taylor. Responses due by 5/23/2024. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/30 10:11 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court directs Plaintiff to submit a new motion to proceed IFP within twenty-one days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/30/2024. (maa)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/30 10:16 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 5/21/2024. (maa)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
3 3 7 pgs order Order Fri 04/26 12:23 PM
RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/26/24. (loh)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/26 12:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by James Lamont Taylor. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(loh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/26 12:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Freedom Mortgage Corporation, McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC, filed by James Lamont Taylor.(loh)
Related: [-]