Original Case: 1:24-cv-00054

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-prici-12771
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 30, 2024 4:17 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Defendant - Appellee
MCCALLA RAYMER LEIBERT PIERCE, LLC
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES TAYLOR
Represented By
James Taylor
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/30/2024 4:17 AM EDT
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant James Taylor on 08/27/2024. Fee Status: IFP Pending. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/16/2024 as to Appellant James Taylor. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/26/2024 as to Appellee Freedom Mortgage Corporation.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 2 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 1 pgs USDC Order # 11
Att: 4 1 pgs USDC Judgment # 12
Att: 5 13 pgs USDC R&R # 8