Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-20002

Maine Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Peter G Cary
Case #: 2:24-ap-02003
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2024
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sachem Capital Corp.
586 East Main Street
Branford, CT 06405
Represented By
Randy J. Creswell, Esq.
Creswell Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Grun Properties LLC
110 Marginal Way, Unit 193
Portland, ME 04101
Represented By
Lee H. Bals, Esq.
Marcus Clegg
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
24 24 court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/24 11:30 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2003 has been closed administratively, but not pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 350(a). Additional pleadings, motions and other papers may be filed in this adversary proceeding without filing a motion to re-open. (rmp)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/24 10:39 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice and Without Costs, and Certificate of Service Filed by Sachem Capital Corp. Related [+]. (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Grun Properties LLC, Plaintiff Grun Properties LLC
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 09/24 11:27 AM
Disposition of Adversary. (rmp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Thu 08/15 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 08/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Amended Order
Monday, August 12, 2024
21 21 order Amended Order Mon 08/12 11:49 AM
Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order Related [+] (rmp)
Related: [-] 19 Pre-Trial Scheduling Order.
Thursday, August 08, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Fri 08/09 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 08/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Pre-Trial Scheduling Order.
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
19 19 order Pre-Trial Scheduling Order Tue 08/06 9:26 AM
Pre-Trial Scheduling Order. Final Pretrial to be set at close of discovery period or as stated in order. Related [+] Trial date set for 3/6/2025 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. (rmp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Grun Properties LLC, Plaintiff Grun Properties LLC
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
18 18 utility Update Other Deadlines (BK) Tue 07/30 12:07 PM
Deadlines Updated (BK) Related [+]. Parties to contact Courtroom Deputy to discuss evidentiary hearing date by 8/6/2024. (kaf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Grun Properties LLC, Plaintiff Grun Properties LLC
17 17 court Minutes of Proceedings Tue 07/30 10:50 AM
Minute Entry: Appearances: David C. Johnson, Esq., Randy J. Creswell, Esq.. Related [+]. Pretrial Conference held. Matter to be set for evidentiary hearing. Parties to confer as to possible hearing dates and contact Courtroom Deputy within 7 days to discuss scheduling. Once hearing date determined, a trial order outlining filing requirements and deadlines will issue. /s/ Peter G. Cary, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. (mep)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint Filed by Counter-Defendant Grun Properties LLC, Plaintiff Grun Properties LLC
16 16 audio Tue 07/30 9:17 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/30/2024 9:06:20 AM ]. File Size [ 1991 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:32 ]. (courtaudio)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
15 15 misc Rule 26(f) Report Mon 07/01 11:50 AM
Rule 26(f) Report Filed by Grun Properties LLC. (Johnson, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 07/01 10:39 AM
Answer to Counterclaim Filed by Grun Properties LLC. (Marcus, George)
Related: [-]
13 13 utility Corrective Entry Mon 07/01 10:34 AM
Corrective Entry. Reason for Entry: Incorrect chapter and incorrect case number appear on the pleading. Document terminated in the system Related [+]. (rmp)
Related: [-] 12 Answer to Counterclaim filed by Counter-Defendant Grun Properties LLC, Plaintiff Grun Properties LLC
12 12 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 07/01 8:47 AM
Answer to Counterclaim Filed by Grun Properties LLC. (Marcus, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Fri 06/14 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 06/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Hearing
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Fri 06/14 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 06/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
9 9 court Hearing Set (misc-event pdf) Tue 06/11 4:06 PM
Notice of Pretrial Scheduling Conference O Related [+]. Pretrial Scheduling Conference scheduled for 7/30/2024 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. (kaf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Grun Properties LLC
8 8 order Extend Time Tue 06/11 1:06 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] deadlines to file answer to counterclaim and to file Rule26(f) are due by 7/2/2024. This Order shall become final in fourteen (14) days unless a party in interest sooner objects, in which case the matter shall be set for hearing and considered by the Court as if this Order had not been entered.(kaf)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 motion Extend Time - BK Case Tue 06/11 9:16 AM
Consent Motion to Extend Time to Enlarge Deadlines Filed by Nathaniel R. Hull, Ch. 7 Trustee. (Hull, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
6 6 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Tue 05/21 5:47 AM
Answer to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and , Counterclaim by Sachem Capital Corp. against Grun Properties LLC with Certificate of Service Filed by Sachem Capital Corp.. (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Commercial Note)
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Commercial Mortgage)
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Notice of Default)
Att: 4 Exhibit D (Notice of Foreclosure)
utility Update Other Deadlines (Adv) Tue 05/21 8:12 AM
Other Deadlines Updated (Adv). Counter-Defendant's Answer due by 6/11/2024. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
5 5 court Minute Entry Continued Tue 05/07 1:39 PM
Minute Entry: Appearances: David C. Johnson, Esq., Randy J. Creswell, Esq., Nathaniel R. Hull, Esq.. Related [+]. Status Conference held. MINUTE ORDER: Answer and Counterclaim by Sachem Capital Corp. due within 14 days. Reply due 14 days thereafter. Rule 26(f) Report due 6/11/2024. Pretrial Scheduling Conference scheduled for 06/18/2024 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. /s/ Peter G. Cary, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. (mep)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Grun Properties LLC
4 4 audio Tue 05/07 9:32 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/7/2024 9:06:26 AM ]. File Size [ 3137 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:43 ]. (courtaudio)
Related: [-]
utility Update Other Deadlines (Adv) Tue 05/07 2:06 PM
Other Deadlines Updated (Adv) Related [+]. Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/11/2024. Answer and Counterclaim by Sachem Capital Corp. due by 5/21/2024. (rmp)
Related: [-] Update Other Deadlines
Sunday, April 28, 2024
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Mon 04/29 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 04/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Hearing
Friday, April 26, 2024
2 2 court Hearing Set (misc-event pdf) Fri 04/26 4:13 PM
Notice of Status Conference Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 5/7/2024 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. (kef)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Grun Properties LLC
1 1 cmp Complaint ** Use Open an AP Case to Open Adversary ** Fri 04/26 3:37 PM
Adversary case 24-02003 Referral Order from Chief Judge Walker, U.S. District Court for the District of Maine (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (kef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint filed in U.S. District Court
Att: 2 U.S. District Court Docket Sheet (23-cv-00462-LEW)