Maine Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Peter G Cary
Case #: 2:24-bk-20002
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2024
Creditor Meeting:May 03, 2024
Converted:Jan 09, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Grun Properties LLC
1 Faraday Dr Unit 1
Cumberland, ME 04021-3177
Represented By
George J. Marcus, Esq.
Marcus Clegg
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Nathaniel R. Hull, Esq.
Verrill Dana, LLP One Portland Square P.O. Box 586
Portland, ME 04112
Represented By
Nathaniel R. Hull, Esq.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee
537 Congress Street, Suite 300
Portland, ME 04101
Represented By
Stephen G. Morrell, Esq.
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info
Jennifer H. Pincus, Esq.
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2024 6:01 PM EDT
Thursday, January 04, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card**ADI** Thu 01/04 10:14 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-20002 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A4543491. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Entry Thu 01/04 10:43 AM
Entry Related [+]. Corporate Ownership Statement has not been filed. (rmp)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Grun Properties LLC
utility Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadlines Thu 01/04 10:50 AM
Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Updated Related [+]. Chapter 11 Plan due by 5/3/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 5/3/2024. (rmp)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Grun Properties LLC
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)**OPEN BK CASE** Thu 01/04 10:12 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Grun Properties LLC. (Marcus, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corp Resolution
Att: 2 1 pgs List of 20 Largest Creditors
Att: 3 Attachment
Att: 4 Certification of Creditor Matrix
Att: 5 Compensation Disclosure
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 01/04 10:35 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen G. Morrell Esq. Filed by on behalf of Office of U.S. Trustee. (Morrell, Stephen)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 01/04 10:36 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jennifer H. Pincus Esq. Filed by on behalf of Office of U.S. Trustee. (Pincus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Thu 01/04 10:37 AM
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Grun Properties LLC Related [+]. (Marcus, George)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Grun Properties LLC
5 5 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 01/04 10:43 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement filed. Filed by Grun Properties LLC. (Marcus, George)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order to Comply Thu 01/04 10:44 AM
Order to Comply and Notice to Dismiss Case. Deficiency Requested: All schedules and statements. Incomplete Filings due by 1/18/2024. (rmp)
Related: [-]
7 7 4 pgs misc Amended Document Thu 01/04 11:51 AM
Amended Voluntary Petition of Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Filed by Grun Properties LLC Related [+]. (Marcus, George)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Grun Properties LLC
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 01/04 12:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service by Randy J. Creswell Esq. Filed by on behalf of Sachem Capital Corp.. (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-]