Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Michael M Mihm
Case #: 2:24-cv-02097
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Terminated:Jun 21, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Monday, November 25, 2024
18 18 appeal USCA Mandate Mon 11/25 2:07 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to13 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffery Todd Henson, Sr: This cause is DISMISSED for failure to timely pay the required docketing fee. SEE WRITTEN MANDATE. (BL)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
17 17 appeal USCA Order Fri 11/01 1:29 PM
USCA Circuit Rule 3(b) Notice as to13 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffery Todd Henson, Sr. (BL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
16 16 misc Mail Returned Wed 10/30 11:00 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re13 Notice of Appeal mail sent to Plaintiff Jeffrey Todd Henson. (BL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
15 15 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing ROA Thu 10/10 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re13 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffery Todd Henson, Sr. USCA Case Number 24-2804 (BL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Circuit Rule 3(b) Notice
14 14 appeal Short Record of Appeal Sent to USCA Wed 10/09 4:50 PM
Short Record of Appeal Sent to US Court of Appeals re13 Notice of Appeal. (BL)
Related: [-]
13 13 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 10/09 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to12 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Jeffery Todd Henson, Sr. (BL)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
12 12 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Fri 10/04 7:46 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 10/4/2024. Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration11 is DENIED. See written order. (KE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
11 11 motion Reconsideration Thu 06/27 2:31 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration and Show of Cause by Plaintiff Jeffery Todd Henson. Responses due by 7/11/2024.(BL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
10 10 misc Judgment Fri 06/21 11:31 AM
JUDGMENT entered. (KE)
Related: [-]
9 9 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 06/21 9:24 AM
ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 6/21/2024. This action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Judgment to enter for Defendant and against Plaintiff. Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis3 is DENIED. Filing fee remains due. Plaintiff's Motion to Request Permission for Electronic Case Filing8 is DENIED. Plaintiff shall show cause by 7/8/24 why this Court should not find that this lawsuit is frivolous, malicious, or both, sufficient to support a finding that it incurs a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915(g), because it is a duplicate suit that Plaintiff knew he had already filed in a different federal district court. See written order. (KE)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 06/17 3:35 PM
MOTION to Request Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Plaintiff Jeffery Todd Henson. Responses due by 7/1/2024. (BL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Change of Address - Prisoner Cases Only Tue 06/11 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffery Todd Henson. (BL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
6 6 misc Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger Wed 06/05 9:30 AM
Second Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger. Trust fund ledger sheets due by 6/20/2024. (KE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
5 5 misc Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger Wed 05/01 2:38 PM
Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger. Trust fund ledger sheets due by 5/15/2024. (KE)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger Wed 05/01 2:19 PM
+++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Jeffery Todd Henson (KE)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/01 2:18 PM
PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Jeffery Todd Henson.(KE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
2 2 notice Notice of Case Opening Wed 05/01 2:06 PM
NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Michael Mihm. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602.Merit Review Deadline set for 5/21/2024.(KE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/01 2:04 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeffery Todd Henson.(KE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Cover Letter,
Att: 3 USM 285 Form