Original Case: 2:24-cv-02097

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-02804
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024
Terminated:Nov 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2024 3:29 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
RUTH ANN REEL
Plaintiff - Appellant
JEFFERY T. HENSON, SR.
Represented By
Jeffery T. Henson Sr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/26/2024 3:28 AM CST
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jeffery T. Henson Sr. by 10/16/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 10/23/2024. Fee or IFP forms due on 10/23/2024 for Appellant Jeffery T. Henson Sr. [1] [7410710] 24-2804 (AP) [Entered: 10/10/2024 02:39 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 21 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Fee Notice
Att: 3 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 4 1 pgs Notice to District Court
2 2 1 pgs This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7410714] 24-2804 (AP) [Entered: 10/10/2024 02:47 PM]
Related: [-]